EP3354669 - SOLID SURFACE PRODUCT AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARCESSO DYNAMICS C/ Pompeu Fabra, 24-36 08105 Sant Fost De Campsentelles / ES | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONTON MARTIN, Ernesto C/ Mar de Bering, 5 43881 Cunit (Tarragona) / ES | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Moreno Sares, Rafael Oficina Ponti SLP C/ Consell de Cent, 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | [2018/31] | Application number, filing date | 16788149.9 | 23.09.2016 | [2018/31] | WO2016ES70667 | Priority number, date | EP20150382464 | 25.09.2015 Original published format: EP 15382464 | [2018/31] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017051053 | Date: | 30.03.2017 | Language: | ES | [2017/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3354669 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3354669 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/48, C08G18/66, C08G18/73, C08G18/24, C08G18/32, C08G18/40, C08G18/44, C08K3/22 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
C08G18/3206 (EP,RU,US);
B29C45/0001 (RU,US);
B29C45/40 (RU,US);
B29C45/7207 (RU,US);
C08G18/242 (RU,US);
C08G18/246 (EP,RU,US);
C08G18/4018 (EP,RU,US);
C08G18/44 (EP,RU,US);
C08G18/4825 (EP,RU,US);
C08G18/664 (EP,RU,US);
C08G18/6674 (EP,RU,US);
C08G18/73 (EP,RU,US);
C08J9/228 (RU,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,RU,US);
B29K2075/00 (US);
C08G2110/0025 (US);
C08J2203/22 (EP,US);
C08J2205/10 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L75/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTES OBERFLÄCHENPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2018/31] | English: | SOLID SURFACE PRODUCT AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING THEREOF | [2018/31] | French: | PRODUIT DE SURFACE SOLIDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2018/31] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2018 | Translation filed | 19.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 19.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2016 | AL | 28.10.2020 | AT | 28.10.2020 | CY | 28.10.2020 | CZ | 28.10.2020 | EE | 28.10.2020 | FI | 28.10.2020 | HR | 28.10.2020 | LT | 28.10.2020 | LV | 28.10.2020 | MC | 28.10.2020 | MK | 28.10.2020 | MT | 28.10.2020 | PL | 28.10.2020 | RO | 28.10.2020 | RS | 28.10.2020 | SE | 28.10.2020 | SK | 28.10.2020 | SM | 28.10.2020 | TR | 28.10.2020 | BG | 28.01.2021 | NO | 28.01.2021 | GR | 29.01.2021 | IS | 28.02.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 23.09.2016 | |
AL | 28.10.2020 | ||
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
MK | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
TR | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 23.09.2016 | |
AL | 28.10.2020 | ||
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
MK | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 23.09.2016 | |
AL | 28.10.2020 | ||
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 23.09.2016 | |
AL | 28.10.2020 | ||
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 28.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5114982 (MENDELSOHN MORRIS A [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7,10,12-20 * column 1, lines 1-13 * * column 2, lines 59-62 * * column 3, lines 26-28; example 1; claims 1, 7 *; | [XI]US5244613 (HURLEY MICHAEL F [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-20 * column 1, lines 1-3 * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, lines 25, 47-52 * * column 6, lines 35-47 * * column 7, lines 38-44 * * column 8, lines 9-13; example 2; claims 1, 4 * [I] 8,9; | [XI]WO2010083958 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8-14 * page 1, lines 1-8; claim 7 *[I] 2,7; | [X]EP2461022 (BASF SE [DE]) [X] 1-7,10-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 19] , [0 44] , [0 46] , [0 47] , [0 62]; claim 1 * |