EP3362513 - POLYMER BLENDS FOR IMPROVED GAS BARRIER PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trevira Holdings GmbH Max-Fischer-Strasse 11 86399 Bobingen / DE | [2020/02] |
Former [2018/49] | For all designated states INVISTA Textiles (U.K.) Limited One St. Peter's Square Manchester M2 3DE / GB | ||
Former [2018/34] | For all designated states Invista North America S.a.r.l. Three Little Ralls Centre 2801 Centerville Road Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAYER, Uwe Bahnhofstrasse 13 86459 Gessertshausen / DE | 02 /
BERBERICH, David W. 38 Inniscrone Drive Avondale, Pennsylvania 19311 / US | 03 /
JONES, JR., Robert L. 183 Christiana Landing Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | 04 /
NEUBIG, Anne Schillstrasse 80k 86167 Augsburg / DE | 05 /
SUN, Qun 154 New Granville Road Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/34] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 16788313.1 | 11.10.2016 | [2018/34] | WO2016US56430 | Priority number, date | US201562242464P | 16.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562242464 P | US201662345018P | 03.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662345018 P | US201662372712P | 09.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662372712 P | [2018/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017066189 | Date: | 20.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3362513 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08L9/00, C08L23/06, C08L23/12 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
C08L23/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/098 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/0005 (KR);
B29D22/003 (KR);
C08L23/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08L39/06 (KR,US);
C08L51/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08L71/00 (KR,US);
C08L77/06 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/06, C08L67/025, C08L51/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/06, C08L71/00 (US,EP);
C08L23/06, C08L77/00 (US,EP);
C08L23/12, C08L51/06, C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08L23/12, C08L71/00 (US,EP);
C08L23/12, C08L77/00 (US,EP);
C08L51/06, C08L77/00, C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08L9/00, C08L71/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Title | German: | POLYMERMISCHUNGEN FÜR VERBESSERTE GASSPERREIGENSCHAFTEN | [2018/34] | English: | POLYMER BLENDS FOR IMPROVED GAS BARRIER PROPERTIES | [2018/34] | French: | MÉLANGES DE POLYMÈRES CONÇUS POUR PRÉSENTER DES PROPRIÉTÉS BARRIÈRES AUX GAZ AMÉLIORÉES | [2018/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 15.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0593189 ; | [X]US2003045640 (AKKAPEDDI MURALI K [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * examples 1-13; claims 1-11,18,23 *; | [A]US2004234791 (CHING TA YEN [US], et al) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [X]EP2112201 (INEOS MFG BELGIUM NV [BE]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0001]; claims 1-5 *; | [X]WO2010042122 (VALSPAR SOURCING INC [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * paragraphs [0007] , [0083] , [0123] , [0124]; claims 1-10 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 20, Database accession no. 1993-162258, XP002765006 & JPH0593189 A 19930416 (TOYOBO KK) [X] 1-25 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0546546 | US5639815 | US5641825 | US6455620 | US7186464 | US7514152 | US7608341 | US7691290 | WO2011031929 | US2012252922 | US8592522 | US2014073741 | US8962740 | US8981013 | - INTERNATIONAL REVIEW OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERING, (2011), vol. 3, pages L53 - 215 | - Plastics Additives, SPRINGER NETHERLANDS, (1998), vol. 1, pages 95 - 107 | - Polymeric Materials Encyclopedia, CRC PRESS, (1996), vol. 6, pages 4823 - 4826 |