EP3293381 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE HAVING INDEPENDENT COMBUSTION CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhou, Hu 3-7-5603 Gaoyangshu Chaoyangxincheng Beijing 100018 / CN | For all designated states Tsinghua Redbud Innovation Institute, Tianjin The Investment Service Center of Economic and Technological Development Zone Baodi District Tianjin / CN | [2018/27] |
Former [2018/11] | For all designated states Zhou, Hu 3-7-5603 Gaoyangshu Chaoyangxincheng Beijing 100018 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Hu Gaoyangshu Chaoyangxincheng 3-7 5603 Beijing 100018 / CN | 02 /
YI, Hanping Room 407, the Investment Service Center of Economic and Technological Development Zone Baodi District Tianjin, 301899 / CN | [2018/42] |
Former [2018/22] | 01 /
ZHOU, Hu Gaoyangshu Chaoyangxincheng 3-7 5603 Beijing 100018 / CN | ||
Former [2018/11] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Berkkam, Ayfer Berkkam Patent Consulting Büklüm Sokak, No. 5/16-3 06680 Kavaklidere Ankara / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/11] | Sun, Yiming HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 33 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16789262.9 | 18.04.2016 | [2018/11] | WO2016CN79527 | Priority number, date | CN201510216187 | 02.05.2015 Original published format: CN201510216187 | [2018/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016177268 | Date: | 10.11.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3293381 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F02B23/10, F02G3/02 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
F02B23/10 (EP,KR,US);
F02G3/02 (US);
F02B33/06 (EP,US);
F02B63/04 (KR);
F02B77/11 (KR);
F02F1/004 (US);
F02F1/18 (US);
F02M37/08 (EP,US);
F02G2254/10 (US);
F02G2258/20 (US);
F02G2270/02 (US);
F02G2270/55 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/11] | F02B23/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Title | German: | VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR MIT UNABHÄNGIGER BRENNKAMMER | [2018/11] | English: | INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE HAVING INDEPENDENT COMBUSTION CHAMBER | [2018/11] | French: | MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE AYANT UNE CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION INDÉPENDANTE | [2018/11] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2017 | Translation filed | 01.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 01.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 01.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 13.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.06.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE17253 (ROETTGER) [X] 1-10 * column 1, paragraph 3 * * column 2, paragraph 2 *; | [X]DE14066 (STOFF) [X] 1-10* column 1 *; | [X]US972504 (BROWN WALTER F [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]GB191506353 (NEU LUCIEN [FR]) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 5 - line 13 *; | [X]US2688230 (HUMPHREYS MILLIKEN) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]US3893295 (AIRAS TIMO) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]US4024702 (HUDSON PERRY DAVID) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]US4179879 (KINCAID ELMO JR [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]US4653269 (JOHNSON DAVID E [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]US6092365 (LEIDEL JAMES A [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 10, line 15 - line 16 *; | [X]US2012124981 (ROHS ULRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0073] * | International search | [PX]CN104819048 (ZHOU HU) [PX] 1-10 * , claims 1-10 *; | [XY]CN2349360Y (GAO FU [CN]) [X] 1-6, 8, 9 * , description, pages 1 and 2, and figure 1, description, pages 1 and 2, and figure 1 * [Y] 7, 10; | [Y]CN102536428 (CREEL LOOP L L C) [Y] 7 * , description, pages 6 and 7, and figure 1 *; | [Y]CN102966430 (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG) [Y] 10 * , description, page 1 *; | [A]CN101566095 (YONG WANG [CN]) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2004226523 (KREUTER PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document * |