05.12.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
12.08.2019 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.07.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.12.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
30.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
30.11.2018 |
Change - inventor |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
30.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
13.07.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
13.07.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
01.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
09.02.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
09.02.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
17.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.11.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
07.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|