EP3292585 - PLATE MEMBER FOR A CELL STACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Temasek Polytechnic 21 Tampines Avenue, 1 Singapore 529757 / SG | [2018/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Ming Blk 219 Toa Payoh Lor 8 05-629 Singapore 310219 / SG | 02 /
CHEN, Yunzhong Blk 663D Jurong West St. 65 09-227 Singapore 644663 / SG | 03 /
WANG, Lei Blk 535 Woodlands Dr. 14 09-599 Singapore 730535 / SG | 04 /
LING, Chun Yu 12 Jalan Buloh Perindu Singapore 457671 / SG | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2018/11] | Application number, filing date | 16789692.7 | 29.04.2016 | [2018/11] | WO2016SG50201 | Priority number, date | SG20151003476Q | 04.05.2015 Original published format: SG10201503476Q | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016178628 | Date: | 10.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3292585 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 10.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/2465, H01M8/248, H01M8/0258, H01M8/0254, H01M8/2483, // H01M8/1018 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
H01M8/0254 (EP,US);
H01M8/0258 (EP,US);
H01M8/2465 (EP,US);
H01M8/248 (EP,US);
H01M8/2483 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/11] | H01M8/2465, H01M8/249, H01M8/0254, H01M8/0258 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Title | German: | PLATTENELEMENT FÜR EINEN ZELLENSTAPEL | [2018/11] | English: | PLATE MEMBER FOR A CELL STACK | [2018/11] | French: | ÉLÉMENT PLAQUE POUR PILE DE CELLULES ÉLÉMENTAIRES | [2018/11] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 24.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 24.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004023090 (PEARSON KENNETH E [US], et al) [A] 11,12,20,21* figures 1,2C,2D, 4A,5B,7A *; | [A]US2011293982 (MARTZ WILLIAM L [US], et al) [A] 11,12,20,21 * figures 1,4 *; | [XI]EP2759011 (INTELLIGENT ENERGY LTD [GB]) [X] 1-10,13-19 * paragraphs [0021] - [0032]; figures 1,2,4,6,7 * [I] 11,12,20,21 | International search | [X]US5750281 (WASHINGTON KIRK B [CA], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 2 lines 10-13, column 5 line 49 to column 6 line 65, column 7 line 14 to column 8 line 61; Figs. 3-5 *; | [X]US6322919 (YANG JEFFERSON Y S [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 9-15, 18-21* column 3 line 19 to column 5 line 35; Figs. 2-6 *; | [X]US2004023090 (PEARSON KENNETH E [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs 0056-0069 and 0083; Figs. 1-7 *; | [X]US7678488 (FRANKLIN JERROLD E [US], et al) [X] 1-6, 13-15, 19 * column 6 lines 4-35; Figs. 5-7 * |