EP3292140 - CANCER IMMUNOTHERAPEUTIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rubicon Biotechnology LLC 26212 Dimension Drive Suite 260 Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | [2018/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARSEGHIAN, Missag c/o Rubicon Biotechnology LLC 26212 Dimension Drive Suite 260 Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | 02 /
RICHIERI, Richard c/o Rubicon Biotechnology LLC 26212 Dimension Drive Suite 260 Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | 03 /
REYNOLDS, Glenn c/o Rubicon Biotechnology LLC 26212 Dimension Drive Suite 260 Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/16] |
Former [2018/11] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16790111.5 | 05.05.2016 | [2018/11] | WO2016US31049 | Priority number, date | US201562157395P | 05.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562157395 P | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016179430 | Date: | 10.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3292140 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3292140 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, C07K14/47, A61K8/14, C07K14/54, C07K16/18, A61K47/42, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, C07K14/525 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
A61K47/6811 (EP,US);
A61K47/68 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/4721 (EP,US);
C07K14/525 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/11] | C07K14/47, C07K14/54, C07K16/18, A61K47/42, A61K39/395, A61K8/14, G01N33/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMMUNOTHERAPEUTIKUM GEGEN KREBS | [2018/11] | English: | CANCER IMMUNOTHERAPEUTIC | [2018/11] | French: | IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE DU CANCER | [2018/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 04.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22163069.2 / EP4079328 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   15.07.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.05.2016 | AL | 20.04.2022 | AT | 20.04.2022 | CY | 20.04.2022 | CZ | 20.04.2022 | EE | 20.04.2022 | FI | 20.04.2022 | HR | 20.04.2022 | LT | 20.04.2022 | LV | 20.04.2022 | MC | 20.04.2022 | MK | 20.04.2022 | MT | 20.04.2022 | NL | 20.04.2022 | PL | 20.04.2022 | RO | 20.04.2022 | RS | 20.04.2022 | SE | 20.04.2022 | SI | 20.04.2022 | SK | 20.04.2022 | SM | 20.04.2022 | TR | 20.04.2022 | IE | 05.05.2022 | LU | 05.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | BG | 20.07.2022 | NO | 20.07.2022 | GR | 21.07.2022 | IS | 20.08.2022 | PT | 22.08.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 05.05.2016 | |
AL | 20.04.2022 | ||
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
MK | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
TR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IE | 05.05.2022 | ||
LU | 05.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 05.05.2016 | |
AL | 20.04.2022 | ||
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
MK | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
IE | 05.05.2022 | ||
LU | 05.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 05.05.2016 | |
AL | 20.04.2022 | ||
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
IE | 05.05.2022 | ||
LU | 05.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 05.05.2016 | |
AL | 20.04.2022 | ||
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
IE | 05.05.2022 | ||
LU | 05.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
IE | 05.05.2022 | ||
LU | 05.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
IE | 05.05.2022 | ||
LU | 05.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
LU | 05.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
LU | 05.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
LU | 05.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 20.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007100904 (REGENT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF OK [US], et al) [X] 1-6,12-15* paragraphs [0040] , [0093]; example 3 *; | [XI]WO2010140886 (MOSAMEDIX BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10,12-14 * whole document, in particular page 2, lines 12-17; page 3, lines 25-36; page 5, lines 4-15 * [I] 7,9,11,15 | International search | [Y]WO2006079120 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 4/1-3, 17, 28-34, 35/32-34, 36-49 * ; abstract; page 5, paragraph 7; page 11, paragraphs 3-4; page 22, paragraph 2; page 36, paragraph 3; page 49, paragraph 3; page 50, paragraph 3; page 53, paragraph 4; page 67, paragraph 2; page 79, paragraphs 2-3; page 95, paragraph 1; page 97, paragraph 2; page 110, paragraph 1; page 127, paragrap *; | [Y]US2009155170 (REUTELINGSPERGER CHRISTIAAN PE [NL], et al) [Y] 1-3, 4/1-3, 17, 28-34, 35/32-34, 36-49 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0020], [0023]; SEQ ID NO. 1; figure 1 *; | [Y] - TAIT, JF et al., "Phospholipid Binding of Annexin V: Effects of Calcium and Membrane Phosphatidylserine Content.", Archives of Biochemistry and Biophysics., (19921000), vol. 298, no. 1, pages 187 - 191, XP024760656 [Y] 36 * ; page 189, column 2, paragraph 1; DOI:10.1016/0003-9861(92)90111-9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-9861(92)90111-9 | Examination | - ALLAVENA ET AL, "The inflammatory micro-environment in tumor progression: The role of tumor-associated macrophages", CRITICAL REVIEWS IN ONCOLOGY/HEMATOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071029), vol. 66, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.CRITREVONC.2007.07.004, ISSN 1040-8428, pages 1 - 9, XP022512187 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.critrevonc.2007.07.004 | - Sandeep Rajput ET AL, "Roles of inflammation in cancer initiation progression and metastasis", Frontiers in Bioscience (Scholar Edition), Searington, US, (20100101), vol. S2, no. 1, doi:10.2741/s55, ISSN 1945-0516, pages 176 - 183, XP055679720 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2741/s55 | by applicant | US2002110868 | US6878370 | US7056695 | US7118750 | US2007172449 | US2007207961 | US7446174 | US2009155170 | US7642340 | US7892558 | - UNGETHUM, Journal of Biological Chemistry, (20110000), vol. 286, no. 3, pages 1903 - 1910 | - LIU, Immunological Reviews, (20080000), vol. 222, pages 9 - 27 | - MARTIN et al., Molecular Cell, (20010000), vol. 7, pages 867 - 877 |