EP3368001 - ORAL CARE PRODUCTS AND METHODS COMPRISING HYDROXYAPATITE BINDING PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2018/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Nina Am Anker 21 68535 Edingen-Neckarhausen / DE | 02 /
SUBKOWSKI, Thomas Holderbuschweg 13a 69198 Schriesheim / DE | 03 /
JENEWEIN, Stefan Weinstr. 16 67434 Neustadt / DE | 04 /
KAROS, Marvin Buergermeister Werner Weick Strasse 73 68723 Plankstadt / DE | 05 /
BOLLSCHWEILER, Claus Karl-Christ-Str.13 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 06 /
WENDEL, Volker Ringstrasse 4 a 64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 07 /
HENKES, Thorsten Rembrandtstr. 24 72622 Nürtingen / DE | 08 /
FACEY, Sandra Oberer Bongart 29 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 09 /
HAUER, Bernhard Merowinger Strasse 1 67136 Fussgoenheim / DE | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2018/36] | Application number, filing date | 16790309.5 | 25.10.2016 | [2018/36] | WO2016EP75651 | Priority number, date | US201562246165P | 26.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562246165 P | [2018/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017072105 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3368001 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/64, A61Q11/00 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K8/21 (US);
A61K8/24 (US);
A61K8/27 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Title | German: | MUNDPFLEGEPRODUKTE UND VERFAHREN MIT HYDROXYAPATIT-BINDENDEN PROTEINEN | [2018/36] | English: | ORAL CARE PRODUCTS AND METHODS COMPRISING HYDROXYAPATITE BINDING PROTEINS | [2018/36] | French: | PRODUITS DE SOIN BUCCAL ET PROCÉDÉS COMPRENANT DES PROTÉINES DE LIAISON À L'HYDROXYAPATITE | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 10.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/40] | 31.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02051865 (AVENTIS PASTEUR [FR], et al) [X] 18* sequence 1 *; | [Y]WO2011157497 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP2409682 (MUELLER WERNER E G [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-14,16,19 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0028]; example - * [Y] 1-19; | [XY]WO2012166626 (UNIV WASHINGTON CT COMMERCIALI [US], et al) [X] 1,4-14,16,19 * pages 1-10; example -; claim - * [Y] 1-19 |