EP3381124 - ELECTROACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER HAVING FEWER SECOND-ORDER NONLINEARITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SnapTrack, Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2018/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUILE, Werner Klarastraße 5a 80636 München / DE | 02 /
MAYER, Markus Akeleistraße 10 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | 03 /
EBNER, Thomas Hunkelestraße 12 81476 München / DE | [2018/40] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16790378.0 | 03.11.2016 | [2018/40] | WO2016EP76542 | Priority number, date | DE201510120654 | 27.11.2015 Original published format: DE102015120654 | [2018/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017089090 | Date: | 01.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3381124 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/02, H03H9/145 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
H03H9/02818 (EP,US);
H03H9/14538 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] | Title | German: | ELEKTROAKUSTISCHER WANDLER MIT VERRINGERTEN NICHTLINEARITÄTEN ZWEITER ORDNUNG | [2018/40] | English: | ELECTROACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER HAVING FEWER SECOND-ORDER NONLINEARITIES | [2018/40] | French: | TRANSDUCTEUR ÉLECTRO-ACOUSTIQUE À NON-LINÉARITÉS DE SECOND ORDRE RÉDUITES | [2018/40] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 19.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/33] | 12.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2009096320 (YAOI MARI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,13-15 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0081]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086]; figure 4 * [A] 5-11,17,18[I] 12,16; | [XAI]JP2009278429 (FUJITSU MEDIA DEVICE KK) [X] 1-3,5,6,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0032]; figure 4 * [A] 7-9,17,18 [I] 4,10-15; | [XAI]US2014001919 (KOMATSU TOMOYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7,16 * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0118]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0127]; figures 5 - 8 * * paragraph [0170] - paragraph [0177]; figures 29 - 32 * [A] 5,6,8-11,17,18 [I] 12-15; | [XAI]US2014361850 (INOUE SHOGO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7,16 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0050]; figures 8, 9 * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0077]; figures 16, 17 * [A] 5,6,8-11,17,18 [I] 4,12-15 | by applicant | - HASHIMOTO; R. KODAIRA; T. OMORI, IEEE INTERNATIONAL ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS, (2014), page 791 | - R. NAKAGAWA; H. KYOYA; H. SHIMIZU; T. KIHARA, "Effective Suppression Method for 2nd nonlinear Signals of SAW-Devices", IEEE INTERNATIONAL ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS, (2014), doi:doi:10.1109/ULTSYM.2014.0192, page 782, XP032667065 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.2014.0192 |