|
10.04.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.04.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.02.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
13.02.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
20.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.01.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
20.01.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.01.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
20.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.11.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.09.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.11.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
03.11.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.11.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
03.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Communication from Examining division including search results r.164(2)(b) EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Search results under rule 164(2)(b) EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2020 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Communication from the examining division with an Invitation to pay a search fee(s) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2019 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.05.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2018 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.10.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
03.10.2018 |
Statement under Art. 19 PCT |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.10.2018 |
Statement under Art. 19 PCT |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
87 |
|
24.03.2017 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
24.01.2017 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
57 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
17 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |