|
21.01.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
25.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
26.05.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.05.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.08.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2018 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2018 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.05.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
70 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
24.03.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.03.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.03.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
25 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |