Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3362414 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201680059833 EP16791156 JP2018518727 US2016056707W US201615271817 US201916387876



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11286195Global Dossier 29.03.2022B2
US2019241459 08.08.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201615271817 21.09.2016
US201916387876 18.04.2019
US201562240674 13.10.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10308544Global Dossier 04.06.2019B2
US2017101336 13.04.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615271817 21.09.2016
US201562240674 13.10.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP7010815BGlobal Dossier 10.02.2022B2
JP2018530510 18.10.2018A
Priority number Date
US201562240674 13.10.2015
WO2016US56707 13.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108137378BGlobal Dossier 20.08.2021B
CN108137378 08.06.2018A
Priority number Date
US201562240674 13.10.2015
WO2016US56707 13.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3362414Global Dossier 22.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201562240674 13.10.2015
WO2016US56707 13.10.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017066362Global Dossier 20.04.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201562240674 13.10.2015