EP3368443 - CAP WITH NESTED HANDLE FOR SPRAY CAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DDP Specialty Electronic Materials US, LLC 974 Centre Road Chestnut Run Plaza 730 Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/41] | For all designated states DDP Specialty Electronic Materials US, LLC 974 Centre Road Chestnut Run Plaza 730 Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | ||
Former [2018/36] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHROER, Daniel R. 1501 Larkin Center Drive 200 Larkin Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | 02 /
BLACK, Marc S. Building 1616 Washington Street Midland, MI 48667 / US | 03 /
SCHUETTE, Chad V. Building 1616 Washington Street Midland, MI 48674 / US | 04 /
SILER, Christopher J. Building 1616 Washington Street Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited Cornerhouse 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2018/36] | Application number, filing date | 16791169.2 | 19.10.2016 | [2018/36] | WO2016US57633 | Priority number, date | US201562246771P | 27.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562246771 P | [2018/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017074756 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3368443 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3368443 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/20, B65D83/30, B65D83/40, B65D83/46 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
B65D83/202 (EP,US);
B65D83/303 (EP,US);
B65D83/40 (EP,US);
B65D83/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAPPE MIT VERSCHACHTELTEM GRIFF FÜR SPRÜHDOSE | [2018/36] | English: | CAP WITH NESTED HANDLE FOR SPRAY CAN | [2018/36] | French: | CAPUCHON AVEC POIGNÉE EMBOÎTÉE POUR AÉROSOL | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 25.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2016 | AL | 10.11.2021 | AT | 10.11.2021 | CY | 10.11.2021 | CZ | 10.11.2021 | DK | 10.11.2021 | EE | 10.11.2021 | ES | 10.11.2021 | FI | 10.11.2021 | HR | 10.11.2021 | IT | 10.11.2021 | LT | 10.11.2021 | LV | 10.11.2021 | MC | 10.11.2021 | MK | 10.11.2021 | MT | 10.11.2021 | NL | 10.11.2021 | PL | 10.11.2021 | RO | 10.11.2021 | RS | 10.11.2021 | SE | 10.11.2021 | SI | 10.11.2021 | SK | 10.11.2021 | SM | 10.11.2021 | BG | 10.02.2022 | NO | 10.02.2022 | GR | 11.02.2022 | IS | 10.03.2022 | PT | 10.03.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 19.10.2016 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
MK | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 19.10.2016 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 19.10.2016 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 10.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE8111028U (SOMOVA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-8 * figure - *; | [X]DE3743896 (WUERTH GMBH & CO KG A [DE]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 48 - column 7, line 18; figures 1-3, 5 *; | [A]US5992707 (GAICHUK ANDREW [CA]) [A] 1-8* column 6, line 32 - line 67; figure 7 *; | [X]US6325256 (LILJEQVIST LANCE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 59; figure - *; | [A]US2006255077 (SUGANO KOKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * figure - *; | [A]EP2508447 (CROWN PACKAGING TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0026] * | Examination | US4353483 | JP2001158485 | JP3176652U | by applicant | US7000805 | US2013334260 |