EP3369038 - TRACKING OBJECT OF INTEREST IN AN OMNIDIRECTIONAL VIDEO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2021/09] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | ||
Former [2018/36] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANKAANPÄÄ, Esa Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
SONI, Shahil Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
MELAKARI, Klaus Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
EIDEN, Niko Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
RAINISTO, Roope Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2018/36] | Application number, filing date | 16791218.7 | 22.10.2016 | [2018/36] | WO2016US58333 | Priority number, date | US201514926854 | 29.10.2015 Original published format: US201514926854 | [2018/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017074821 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3369038 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3369038 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/25, G06V20/40, G06V20/52 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
G06V20/40 (EP,US);
H04N23/62 (CN);
G06V10/25 (EP,US);
G06V20/52 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (US);
H04N23/698 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/36] | G06K9/32, G06K9/00, G06T7/20, H04N7/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFOLGUNG EINES OBJEKTS VON INTERESSE IN EINEM OMNIDIREKTIONALEN VIDEO | [2018/36] | English: | TRACKING OBJECT OF INTEREST IN AN OMNIDIRECTIONAL VIDEO | [2018/36] | French: | SUIVI D'OBJET D'INTERÊT DANS UNE VIDEO OMNIDIRECTIONNELLE | [2023/46] |
Former [2018/36] | SUIVI D'UN OBJET D'INTÉRÊT DANS UNE VIDÉO OMNIDIRECTIONNELLE | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 19.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2009097449 (ENFORCEMENT VIDEO LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,11-13 * abstract * [I] 2,4-10,14,15; | [I]US2012163657 (SHELLSHEAR ANDREW JOHN [AU]) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP2927885 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 8* abstract *; | [I] - FAN CHEN ET AL, "Personalized production of basketball videos from multi-sensored data under limited display resolution", COMPUTER VISION AND IMAGE UNDERSTANDING., US, (20100630), vol. 114, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.cviu.2010.01.005, ISSN 1077-3142, pages 667 - 680, XP055226622 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cviu.2010.01.005 |