EP3353685 - MOBILE USER INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUSAIN, Ali, Adil c/o Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2018/31] | Application number, filing date | 16791227.8 | 24.10.2016 | [2018/31] | WO2016US58547 | Priority number, date | US201514935258 | 06.11.2015 Original published format: US201514935258 | [2018/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017078958 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3353685 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
G06F16/904 (EP,GB,KR,US);
G06F3/04842 (KR,US);
G06F3/0482 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Title | German: | MOBILE BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHE | [2018/31] | English: | MOBILE USER INTERFACE | [2018/31] | French: | INTERFACE D'UTILISATEUR MOBILE | [2018/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 24.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.09.2021 | 18.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/01] | 28.08.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/01] | 21.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009063517 (WRIGHT DAWN [US], et al) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [A]US2011055767 (CHEN CHUN-YI [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 24] - [0060] *; | [A]US2014095972 (MOLESKY LORY [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2014358913 (CAI JIE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10,17,18 * paragraphs [0020] - [0025] - [0 42] - [0062]; figures 1,3-8 * [I] 3-8,11-16,19-24 |