EP3377834 - DOMESTIC REFRIGERATION APPLIANCE AND METHOD COMPRISING A DOMESTIC REFRIGERATION APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLANDER, Ulrich Hirtenbergweg 13 89278 Nersingen / DE | 02 /
GLASER, Benjamin Riedhauserstrasse 29A 89415 Lauingen (Donau) / DE | 03 /
LUDWIG, Denis Albstrasse 5 89168 Niederstotzingen / DE | [2018/39] | Application number, filing date | 16791355.7 | 28.10.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016EP76023 | Priority number, date | DE201510222924 | 20.11.2015 Original published format: DE102015222924 | [2018/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017084862 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3377834 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F25D17/04, F25D23/02 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
F25D17/047 (EP);
F25D23/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSKÄLTEGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN MIT EINER HAUSHALTSKÄLTEGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/39] | English: | DOMESTIC REFRIGERATION APPLIANCE AND METHOD COMPRISING A DOMESTIC REFRIGERATION APPLIANCE | [2018/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'APPAREIL MÉNAGER FRIGORIFIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF D'APPAREIL MÉNAGER FRIGORIFIQUE | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 10.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/29] | 20.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2010077778 (KIM BRIAN S [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,11,12 * paragraphs [0004] - [0031]; figures 1-4 * [I] 7; | [X]EP2597403 (INDESIT COMPANY BEYAZ ESYA SANAYI VE TICARET ANONIM SIRKETI [TR]) [X] 1-3,6,9,11,12 * paragraphs [0003] - [0027]; figures 1-7 *; | [X]DE102012013121 (LIEBHERR HAUSGERAETE LIENZ [AT]) [X] 1,4,5,10-12 * paragraphs [0001] - [0052]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE102009003261 | DE102008021375 |