EP3375149 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SELECTIVELY HIDING BUS OSCILLATIONS DURING DATA RECEPTION VIA A BUS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTWICH, Florian Lerchenstr. 17/1 72762 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
WALKER, Steffen Matheus-Wagner-Str. 12 72770 Reutlingen / DE | [2018/38] | Application number, filing date | 16791400.1 | 07.11.2016 | [2018/38] | WO2016EP76778 | Priority number, date | DE201510222334 | 12.11.2015 Original published format: DE102015222334 | [2018/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017080938 | Date: | 18.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3375149 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40, H04L25/02, H04L25/03 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
H04L12/40032 (EP,KR,US);
G06F13/4004 (EP,US);
H04L25/0272 (EP,US);
H04L25/0278 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/03834 (KR,US);
H04L2012/40215 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2012/40273 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/38] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SELEKTIVEN AUSBLENDEN VON BUSSCHWINGUNGEN BEIM DATENEMPFANG ÜBER EIN BUSSYSTEM | [2018/38] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SELECTIVELY HIDING BUS OSCILLATIONS DURING DATA RECEPTION VIA A BUS SYSTEM | [2018/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE SUPPRESSION SÉLECTIVE D'OSCILLATIONS DE BUS LORS DE LA RÉCEPTION DE DONNÉES PAR LE BIAIS D'UN SYSTÈME DE BUS | [2018/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/26] | 11.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102009008182 (DENSO CORP [JP], et al); | [I]WO2011128956 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]US2011285424 (SUZUKI YOUICHIROU [JP], et al); | [A]US2012293230 (MORI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) |