EP3295865 - METHOD FOR DETECTING, IN NONINVASIVE IN-VIVO MANNER, SKIN DAMAGE INDUCED BY ULTRAVIOLET LIGHT, AND DETECTION DEVICE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Jiao Tong University No. 800 Dongchuan Road Shanghai 200240 / CN | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YING, Weihai Med-X Building Room 211 Shanghai Jiao Tong University 1954 Huashan Road Shanghai 200030 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Mingchao Med-X Building Room 314 Shanghai Jiao Tong University 1954 Huashan Road Shanghai 200030 / CN | 03 /
HE, Hao Med-X Building Room 207 Shanghai Jiao Tong University 1954 Huashan Road Shanghai 200030 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Jie Med-X Building Room 314 Shanghai Jiao Tong University 1954 Huashan Road Shanghai 200030 / CN | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Hervouet-Malbec, Sylvie, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 16791945.5 | 25.03.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016CN77399 | Priority number, date | CN201510231662 | 08.05.2015 Original published format: CN201510231662 | [2018/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016180095 | Date: | 17.11.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3295865 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
A61B5/0071 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/0064 (CN);
A61B5/00 (US);
A61B5/0062 (US);
A61B5/441 (CN);
A61B5/445 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION, AUF NICHTINVASIVER IN-VIVO-WEISE, VON DURCH ULTRAVIOLETTEM LICHT VERURSACHTEN HAUTSCHÄDEN UND DETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2018/12] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING, IN NONINVASIVE IN-VIVO MANNER, SKIN DAMAGE INDUCED BY ULTRAVIOLET LIGHT, AND DETECTION DEVICE THEREOF | [2018/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION IN VIVO, DE MANIÈRE NON INVASIVE, DE LÉSIONS CUTANÉES INDUITES PAR LA LUMIÈRE ULTRAVIOLETTE, ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION ASSOCIÉ | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2017 | Translation filed | 13.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 13.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2018 | 31.03.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2019 | 31.03.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005131304 (STAMATAS GEORGIOS [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008269576 (KANG UK [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2014163391 (KOIZUMI NORIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 9-12 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0090] * * figures 8,18 *; | [A]US2014163389 (KUDENOV MICHAEL W [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] ** figure 1 * | International search | [XY]US5701902 (VARI SANDOR G [US], et al) [X] 9, 12 * , description, column 1, lines 20-33 and column 4, line 15 to column 6, line 25, and figures, description, column 1, lines 20-33 and column 4, line 15 to column 6, line 25, and figures 1-11 * [Y] 10-11; | [A]CN101716069 (ANHUI INST OPTICS & FINE MECH) [A] 9-12 * , the whole document *; | [A]JP2013138720 (SHARP KK) [A] 9-12 * , the whole document *; | [Y]CN103930767 (OREAL) [Y] 10-11 * , description, paragraphs [0029]-[0041] and [0086]-[0102], and figure 2 *; | [A]CN105338888 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV) [A] 9-12* , the whole document * |