EP3294443 - HOME SODA MACHINE OPERATING AT LOW PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SodaStream Industries Ltd. Gilboa Street P.O. Box 280 Airport City 7019900 Ben Gurion Airport / IL | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Avi 8/4 Hadishon Street 9695608 Jerusalem / IL | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP 16 Upper Woburn Place London WC1H 0BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 16792271.5 | 09.05.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016IB52625 | Priority number, date | US201562161285P | 14.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562161285 P | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016181279 | Date: | 17.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3294443 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 17.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04, B01F15/02, A23L2/54 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
A23L2/54 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01F23/2361 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01F23/231 (IL,KR);
B01F23/2364 (EP,IL,US);
B01F23/237621 (IL,KR);
B01F35/2213 (IL,KR);
|
Former IPC [2018/12] | B01F3/04, A23L2/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Title | German: | BEI NIEDRIGEM DRUCK FUNKTIONIERENDE HAUSHALTSSODAMASCHINE | [2018/12] | English: | HOME SODA MACHINE OPERATING AT LOW PRESSURE | [2018/12] | French: | MACHINE À SODA DOMESTIQUE FONCTIONNANT À BASSE PRESSION | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 04.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 10.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2046112 (THORN SVENSKA) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * page 2, line 31 - line 130 *; | [XI]US5329975 (HEITEL ROBERT G [US]) [X] 1-3,6 * abstract * * figures 1-12 * * column 4, line 30 - column 12, line 35 * [I] 4,5,7-10; | [A]WO0017090 (SODA CLUB CO2 AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-10 * pages 18-21 * * abstract ** figures 1-7 *; | [XI]GB2351243 (ATCHISON INVEST LTD [GI]) [X] 1-4,6-10 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * * pages 4,9-11 * [I] 5; | [IA]US2014356491 (GIARDINO NICHOLAS [US]) [I] 1,3,4,6-10 * figures 1-7 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0032] * [A] 2,5 | International search | [A]US5178799 (BROWN JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-11* Entire Document *; | [YA]US7288276 (RONA GYORGY [HU], et al) [Y] 1, 6, 7 * Entire Document Entire Document * [A] 2-5, 8-11; | [A]US2014272052 (BUENO SERGE JOSEPH [IL]) [A] 1-11 * Entire Document *; | [YA]US2015014871 (RING ALLAN [IL], et al) [Y] 1, 6, 7 * Entire Document Entire Document * [A] 2-5, 8-11; | [A]WO2015021498 (BREVILLE R & D PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1-11 * Entire Document * |