EP3280141 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENCODING AND DECODING IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIN, Jung-Hye 104-401 15 Yehyeon-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17103 / KR | 02 /
ALSHINA, Elena 225-1604 11 Bongyeong-ro 1744beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16713 / KR | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2018/06] | Application number, filing date | 16792912.4 | 04.05.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016KR04714 | Priority number, date | US201562160169P | 12.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562160169 P | [2018/06] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016182266 | Date: | 17.11.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3280141 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/11, H04N19/593, H04N19/105, H04N19/182, H04N19/117, H04N19/82, H04N19/70 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
H04N19/593 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/105 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/11 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/117 (EP,US);
H04N19/182 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/06] | H04N19/11, H04N19/593, H04N19/105, H04N19/182 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Title | German: | VEFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR CODIERUNG UND DECODIERUNG EINES BILDES | [2018/06] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENCODING AND DECODING IMAGE | [2018/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CODAGE ET DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2017 | Translation filed | 03.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 03.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 14.11.2019 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 12.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 13.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2658263 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-5,7-10,12-14 * paragraphs [0024] - [0080] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 6,11; | [XA]EP2773116 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,7,12-14 * paragraphs [0210] - [0220] * * figures 20-23, 25b, 26 * [A] 2-6,8-11; | [X] - CHAN-WON SEO ET AL, "Bi-Intra Prediction using slope information", 4. JCT-VC MEETING; 95. MPEG MEETING; 20-1-2011 - 28-1-2011; DAEGU;(JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110115), no. JCTVC-D287, XP030008327 [X] 1-3,6-9,11-14 * section "2.1. Bi-Intra-Prediction (BIP)" * * section "2.2 Offset Clipping" * | [A] - ZHANG NAN ET AL, "Spatial prediction based intra-coding", 2004 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO : JUNE 27 - 30, 2004, TAIPEI, TAIWAN, IEEE OPERATIONS CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20040627), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ICME.2004.1394134, ISBN 978-0-7803-8603-7, pages 97 - 100, XP010770753 [A] 1,6,7,14 * section "3. Simplified modes" * * Fig. 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICME.2004.1394134 | International search | [XY]JP2010176239 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1, 4, 6-7, 11-14 * See paragraphs [0100]-[0107], [0133], claims 16, 19 and figure 11. * [Y] 2-3, 5, 8-10; | [Y]JP2011233972 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 2-3, 5, 8-10 * See paragraphs [0045]-[0047], [0054]-[0057], [0082]-[0083], claim 3 and figure 4. *; | [A]KR20090132474 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0063]-[0071] and figures 5a-5d. *; | [A]JP2013135366 (KDDI CORP) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0041]-[0048] and 2. *; | [A]KR20090083716 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0039]-[0041], [0058]-[0062] and figures 7-8b. * |