EP3295118 - DISTANCE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magik Eye Inc. 235 East 40th Street Suite 91 New York, New York 10016 / US | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIMURA, Akiteru 1-19-901 Myojin-Cho 4-Chome Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-004 / JP | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Asquith, Julian Peter Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 16793300.1 | 09.05.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016US31412 | Priority number, date | US201562159286P | 10.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562159286 P | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016182982 | Date: | 17.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3295118 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/02, G01C3/08, G02B6/34, F21V8/00, G02B27/42, H04N5/00 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
G01C3/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F21V5/008 (CN,KR,US);
G01B11/026 (EP,US);
G02B27/425 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B6/0005 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B6/34 (CN,US);
G06V20/58 (CN,KR,US);
H01S5/423 (CN,KR,US);
H04N23/56 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/47] | G01B11/02, G01C3/08, G02B6/34, F21V8/00, G02B27/42, H04N5/225 | ||
Former IPC [2018/12] | G01B11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Title | German: | ABSTANDSSENSOR | [2018/12] | English: | DISTANCE SENSOR | [2018/12] | French: | CAPTEUR DE DISTANCE | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/02] | 23.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US4914460 (CAIMI FRANK M [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,5,7[I] 8-10 | International search | [Y]US5980454 (BROOME BARRY [US]) [Y] 1-20 * See abstract. column 5. line 7-column 7. line 22 and figures 1. 2. *; | [Y]US2006055942 (KRATTIGER BEAT [CH]) [Y] 9, 11-20 * See abstract, paragraphs [0047]-[0063] and figures 5, 6, 8. *; | [Y]US2006290781 (HAMA SOICHI [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * See abstract, paragraphs [0043]-[0064] and figures 1-4. *; | [A]US2010149315 (QU JIANAN [CN], et al) [A] 1-20 * See abstract, paragraph [0059] and figure 1. *; | [A]US2015077764 (BRAKER BENJAMIN [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0040]-[0042] and figure 1. * | by applicant | US4914460 |