08.12.2023 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] |
24.08.2023 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.07.2023 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.03.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.03.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] |
17.03.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] |
20.07.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
23.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.11.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.07.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.12.2019 |
First examination report |
|
30.11.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.04.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.10.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
19.10.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
19.10.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
13.07.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
13.07.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
09.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.02.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
22.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.11.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
03.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.11.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|