Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018106671 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2018 | A3 | WO2018106671 | 19.07.2018 | A9 | WO2018106671 | 14.06.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201662430998 | 07.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018106670 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662430998 | 07.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016065130 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | US201462068250 | 24.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016328854 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | US201615149429 | 09.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11002537 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2021 | B2 | US2020003556 | 02.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662430998 | 07.12.2016 | US201916460685 | 02.07.2019 | US201715832085 | 05.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10488192 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2019 | B2 | US2018143018 | 24.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715832066 | 05.12.2017 | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | US201615149323 | 09.05.2016 | US201662430998 | 07.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10337860 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2019 | B2 | US2018156609 | 07.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662430998 | 07.12.2016 | US201715832085 | 05.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10268906 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2019 | B2 | US2016117561 | 28.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | US201514920246 | 22.10.2015 | US201462068250 | 24.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10228243 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2019 | B2 | US2016327385 | 10.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | US201615149323 | 09.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180006377 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | WO2016US31424 | 09.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180005659 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | WO2016US31412 | 09.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170072319 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | WO2015US56883 | 22.10.2015 | US201462068250 | 24.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102595391B | Global Dossier | 31.10.2023 | B1 | KR20190085151 | 17.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662430998 | 07.12.2016 | WO2017US64681 | 05.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102543275B | Global Dossier | 16.06.2023 | B1 | KR20190085150 | 17.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662430998 | 07.12.2016 | WO2017US64680 | 05.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022050708 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019530764 | 05.12.2017 | US201662430998 | 07.12.2016 | WO2017US64680 | 05.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020501156 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662430998 | 07.12.2016 | WO2017US64680 | 05.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7133554B | Global Dossier | 08.09.2022 | B2 | JP2020501155 | 16.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662430998 | 07.12.2016 | WO2017US64681 | 05.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6876776B | Global Dossier | 26.05.2021 | B2 | JP2020024234 | 13.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | US201462068250 | 24.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6761817B | Global Dossier | 30.09.2020 | B2 | JP2018514783 | 07.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | WO2016US31412 | 09.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018514780 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | WO2016US31424 | 09.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6648147B | Global Dossier | 14.02.2020 | B2 | JP2017532580 | 02.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | WO2015US56883 | 22.10.2015 | US201462068250 | 24.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3552180 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2022 | B1 | EP3552180 | 29.07.2020 | A4 | EP3552180 | 16.10.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201662430998 | 07.12.2016 | WO2017US64681 | 05.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3551965 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2020 | A4 | EP3551965 | 16.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662430998 | 07.12.2016 | WO2017US64680 | 05.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3295119 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2019 | A4 | EP3295119 | 21.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | WO2016US31424 | 09.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3209523 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2018 | A4 | EP3209523 | 30.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | WO2015US56883 | 22.10.2015 | US201462068250 | 24.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110234955B | Global Dossier | 29.03.2022 | B | CN110234955 | 13.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662430998 | 07.12.2016 | WO2017US64680 | 05.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110178156B | Global Dossier | 14.11.2023 | B | CN110178156 | 27.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662430998 | 07.12.2016 | WO2017US64681 | 05.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107896506 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | WO2016US31424 | 09.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107850420B | Global Dossier | 12.01.2021 | B | CN107850420 | 27.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | WO2016US31412 | 09.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107407553B | Global Dossier | 28.07.2020 | B | CN107407553 | 28.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | WO2015US56883 | 22.10.2015 | US201462068250 | 24.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3295118 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2018 | A4 | EP3295118 | 21.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | WO2016US31412 | 09.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1247272 | 21.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | WO2015US56883 | 22.10.2015 | US201462068250 | 24.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI700508B | 01.08.2020 | B | TW201621349 | 16.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | WO2015US56883 | 22.10.2015 | US201514920246 | 22.10.2015 | US201462068250 | 24.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI758368B | 21.03.2022 | B | TW201830049 | 16.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662430998 | 07.12.2016 | WO2017US64681 | 05.12.2017 | US201715832085 | 05.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI758367B | 21.03.2022 | B | TW201833582 | 16.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715832066 | 05.12.2017 | US201662430998 | 07.12.2016 | WO2017US64680 | 05.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016182985 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016182982 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020148784 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1252962 | 06.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1253380 | 14.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201706563 | 16.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI687652B | 11.03.2020 | B | TW201706564 | 16.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562159286 | 10.05.2015 |