EP3294454 - PROCESS TO PRODUCE MODIFIED CLAY, SUPPORTED METALLOCENE POLYMERIZATION CATALYST, CATALYST PRODUCED AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. 7500 Grace Drive Columbia, MD 21044 / US | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Michael, D. 10329 Scaggsville Road Laurel, MD 20723 / US | 02 /
MCCAULEY, John, Robert 2316 Bollinger Mill Road Finksburg, MD 21048 / US | 03 /
SINGLETON, Andrew, G. 4712 Dorsey Hall Drive 406 Ellicott City, MD 21042 / US | 04 /
MICHOS, Demetrius 13649 Highland Road Clarksville, MD 21029 / US | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16793317.5 | 09.05.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016US31464 | Priority number, date | US201562159555P | 11.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562159555 P | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016183006 | Date: | 17.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3294454 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/659, C08F4/6592, C08F10/02, B01J31/14, B01J31/16, B01J31/22 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
C08F10/02 (EP,US);
C08F4/06 (KR,RU);
B01J29/04 (RU);
B01J31/00 (EP,RU,US);
B01J31/143 (EP,KR,US);
B01J31/1616 (EP,KR,US);
B01J31/2295 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/0018 (KR);
C08F10/00 (KR,RU);
C08F2/38 (KR);
C08F4/02 (KR);
C08F4/545 (KR);
C08F4/65916 (KR);
B01J2231/20 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2531/46 (EP,US);
B01J2531/48 (EP,US);
B01J2531/49 (EP,US);
C08F2410/01 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/65912 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/65916 (EP,US);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/12 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2018/12] | B01J29/04, B01J31/00, C08F4/06, C08F10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MODIFIZIERTEM TON, GETRÄGERTER METALLOCENPOLYMERISATIONSKATALYSATOR, HERGESTELLTER KATALYSATOR UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2018/12] | English: | PROCESS TO PRODUCE MODIFIED CLAY, SUPPORTED METALLOCENE POLYMERIZATION CATALYST, CATALYST PRODUCED AND USE THEREOF | [2018/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE ARGILE MODIFIÉE, CATALYSEUR DE POLYMÉRISATION MÉTALLOCÈNE SUPPORTÉ, CATALYSEUR PRODUIT ET SON UTILISATION | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 30.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP3635822B (TOSOH CORP) [I] 14,15 * page 6, paragraph 21 * * page 9, paragraph 51 - page 10, paragraph 55; example 1 *; | [I]JP3772472B (TOSOH CORP) [I] 14,15 * page 10, paragraph 21 - page 11 ** page 23, paragraph 53 - page 24, paragraph 58; example 1 *; | [XA] - H.Y ZHU ET AL, "Porosity and Thermal Stability of Montmorillonite Pillared with Mixed Oxides of Lanthanum, Calcium and Aluminium", JOURNAL OF POROUS MATERIALS., NL, (19970331), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.1023/A:1009614921459, ISSN 1380-2224, pages 17 - 26, XP055543190 [X] 1-3,5,6 * Experimental; page 18 * * abstract * [A] 4,7-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1009614921459 | International search | [Y]US4661464 (ATKINS MARTIN P [GB]) [Y] 49* ; column 3, lines 65-68; column 4, lines 1-5 *; | [Y]EP0279251 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) [Y] 5/4/2-3, 27/26/24-25, 49 * ; abstract; page 3, lines 24-25; page 4, lines 40-55; page 5, lines 9-39; page 6, lines 12-19; page 7, lines 3-56; page 9, lines 37-48; claim 5 *; | [Y]US5059568 (MCCAULEY JOHN F [US]) [Y] 49 * ; column 15, lines 30-37 *; | [Y]US2002099154 (HAMED ORASS [SA], et al) [Y] 20-21, 22/20-21, 23-25, 26/24-25, 27/26/24-25 * ; paragraphs [0009], [0019]; claim 10 *; | [XY]US2006040822 (SHVEIMA JOSEPH S [US], et al) [X] 1, 19, 41-42, 45/41-42, 46/45/41-42, 47/46/45/41-42 * ; paragraphs [0008], [0011]-[0012], [0029], [0037]-[0038], [0044]-[0051], [0063]-[0070], [0105]-[0111], [0136], [0139] * [Y] 2-3, 4/2-3, 5/4/2-3, 20-21, 22/20-21, 23-25, 26/24-25, 27/26/24-25, 43/41-42, 44/41-42, 49; | [Y]US2013317185 (FANTINEL FABIANA [IT], et al) [Y] 49 * ; paragraphs [0032]-[0033] *; | [Y] - BOOIJ, ER et al., "Preparation, structural characteristics and catalytic properties of large-pore rare earth element (Ce, La)/A1-pillared smectites.", Clays and Clay Minerals., (19960000), vol. 44, no. 6, pages 774 - 780, XP055328586 [Y] 2-3, 4/2-3, 5/4/2-3, 21, 22/20-21, 23-25, 26/24-25, 27/26/24-25, 43/41-42, 44/41-42, 49 | by applicant | US2196016 | US3242099 | US3248179 | US4176090 | US4248739 | US4424341 | US4501885 | US4613484 | JPS635822B | US4737280 | US4794096 | US4808561 | US4939217 | US5191132 | US5202295 | US5210352 | US5347026 | US5399636 | US5401817 | US5420320 | US5436305 | US5451649 | US5480848 | US5496781 | US5498581 | US5541272 | US5554795 | US5563284 | US5565592 | US5571880 | US5576259 | US5594078 | US5597892 | US5631335 | US5631203 | US5654454 | US5668230 | US5705478 | US5705579 | US5807938 | US5919983 | US2006040822 | - "Fifth National Conference on Clays and Clay Minerals", J.L. MCATEE, JR., Proceedings of the Conference: ''Heterogeneity In Montmorillonite, National Academy of Sciences, (19580000), vol. 566, page 282 | - R.A. SCHOONHEYDT et al., "Pillared Clays and Pillared Layered Solids", Pure Appl. Chem., (19990000), vol. 71, no. 12, pages 2367 - 2371, XP055050859 | - E.P. BARRETTL.G. JOYNERP.P. HALENDA, "The Determination of Pore Volume and Area Distributions in Porous Substances. I. Computations from Nitrogen Isotherms", J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19510000), vol. 73, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1021/ja01145a126, pages 373 - 380, XP001145601 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01145a126 | - S. BRUNAUERP. EMMETTE. TELLER, the Journal of American Chemical Society, (19390000), vol. 60 | - H. L. RITTERL. C. DRAKE, Industrial and Engineering Chemistry, Analytical Edition, (19450000), vol. 17, page 787 |