EP3295497 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR FOR PORTABLE MULTI-CELL ELECTRICAL ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gogoro Inc. 3806 Central Plaza 18 Harbour Road Wanchai, Hong Kong / CN | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Tai-Tsun 14F. No. 360-10 Sec. 2 Zhonghua Rd. Xinzhuang Dist. 242 New Taipei City / TW | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2024/26] |
Former [2018/12] | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 16793369.6 | 10.05.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016US31653 | Priority number, date | US201562159594P | 11.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562159594 P | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016183086 | Date: | 17.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3295497 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3295497 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/24, H01M50/503, H01M50/51 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H01R13/245 (EP,US);
H01M50/503 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/51 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/12] | H01M2/26, H01M2/30, H01M2/10, H01M2/20, H01R13/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER STECKVERBINDER FÜR TRAGBARE MEHRZELLIGE ELEKTRISCHE ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2018/12] | English: | ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR FOR PORTABLE MULTI-CELL ELECTRICAL ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE | [2018/12] | French: | CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE POUR DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE MULTI-CELLULAIRE PORTABLE | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 24.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2013131548 (HUSQVARNA AB [SE], et al); | [X]US2015086834 (CHO MAN-SIK [KR]) | International search | [A]US2008254357 (LIU YAO-CHUAN [TW]); | [A]US2009075163 (SHEVOCK BRYAN [US], et al); | [A]US2011008655 (WHITE DANIEL J [US], et al); | [A]US8114540 (TRESTER DALE B [US], et al); | [XA]WO2013131548 (HUSQVARNA AB [SE], et al) | Examination | EP2608243 | WO2014122893 | EP2955738 |