EP3294858 - BLOOD CULTURE SYSTEM WITH LOW MEDIA VOLUME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG-WOYTOWITZ, Mei 127 Stanmore Road Baltimore, MD 21212 / US | 02 /
SHI, Song 1916 Billy Barton Circle Reisterstown, MD 21136 / US | 03 /
CHANG, Xiaofei 18 Tenby Court Timonium, MD 21093 / US | 04 /
ZHOU, James, Y. 6392 Grateful Heart Gate Columbia, MD 21044 / US | 05 /
BRASCH, Michael, A. 20931 Sunnyacres Road Gaithersburg, MD 20882 / US | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2018/12] | Application number, filing date | 16793603.8 | 13.05.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016US32341 | Priority number, date | US201562161380P | 14.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562161380 P | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016183434 | Date: | 17.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3294858 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, C12M1/34, C12N5/078 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
C12M23/00 (EP,US);
C12M23/08 (US);
C12M41/46 (US);
C12N5/0634 (EP,US);
C12N2501/999 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Title | German: | BLUTKULTURSYSTEM MIT NIEDRIGEM MEDIENVOLUMEN | [2018/12] | English: | BLOOD CULTURE SYSTEM WITH LOW MEDIA VOLUME | [2018/12] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CULTURE DE SANG AVEC FAIBLE VOLUME DE MILIEU | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 30.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011029249 (BEATY PATRICK SHAWN [US]); | International search | [A]US6410334 (SCHMOLZ MANFRED [DE]); | [X]US2011029249 (BEATY PATRICK SHAWN [US]); |