EP3373849 - PATTERN FRAMEWORK FOR FORMING A DENTAL PROSTHESIS COMPRISING PILLARS AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING SUCH PATTERN FRAMEWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cendres + Métaux SA Rue de Boujean 122 P.O. Box 2501 Bienne / CH | [2018/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLOMARITIS, Brian Edgecroft Heaton, Rushton Spencer Macclesfiled, SK110SH / GB | 02 /
WÄLCHLI, Patrick Kirchstrasse 56 2540 Grenchen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/38] | 01 /
PLOMARITIS, Brian March House March Lane Mollington Oxfordshire OX17 1BP / GB | ||
02 /
WÄLCHLI, Patrick Solothurnstrasse 20 2540 Grenchen / CH | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/38] | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Av. J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 16794070.9 | 03.11.2016 | [2018/38] | WO2016IB56618 | Priority number, date | CH20150001625 | 09.11.2015 Original published format: CH 16252015 | [2018/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017081583 | Date: | 18.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3373849 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/10, A61C8/00, A61C13/00, A61C13/103 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
A61C13/102 (EP);
A61C13/0003 (EP);
A61C13/0004 (EP);
A61C13/1009 (EP);
A61C8/0048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/38] | Title | German: | MUSTERRAHMEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ZAHNERSATZES MIT SÄULEN MIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG SOLCH EINES MUSTERRAHMENS | [2018/38] | English: | PATTERN FRAMEWORK FOR FORMING A DENTAL PROSTHESIS COMPRISING PILLARS AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING SUCH PATTERN FRAMEWORK | [2018/38] | French: | STRUCTURE À MOTIF POUR LA FORMATION D'UNE PROTHÈSE DENTAIRE COMPRENANT DES MONTANTS ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE TELLE STRUCTURE À MOTIF | [2018/38] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 31.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/51] | 11.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE102007002178 (AEPSILON RECHTEVERWALTUNGS GMB [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-20,23 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-4; claims 1-18 * [I] 3,21,22; | [XI]JP2008212586 (KANEKO MASAO, et al) [X] 1,3-7,14-16,18,19,22 * abstract * [I] 2,8-13,17,20,21,23; | [XI]US2013167380 (BALSHI THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 1,3-19,22,23 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-13; claims 1-21 * [I] 2,20,21; | [XP]US2015320520 (SCHULTER DREW [US], et al) [XP] 1-23* paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0129]; figures 1-23B * |