EP3349685 - FUNCTIONAL BIOLOGICAL PATCH FOR PELVIC FLOOR PROLAPSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Assut Europe S.p.A. Via Giuseppe Gregoraci 12 00173 Rome / IT | [2018/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DODERO, Danilo Corso Europa n° 1642/9 16166 Genova / IT | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | IP Sextant s.r.l. Via A. Salandra, n.18 00187 Rome / IT | [2018/30] | Application number, filing date | 16795167.2 | 13.09.2016 | [2018/30] | WO2016IT00209 | Priority number, date | IT2015UB03642 | 15.09.2015 Original published format: IT UB20153642 | [2018/30] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017046824 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3349685 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, A61L27/36 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
A61F2/0045 (EP);
A61F2230/0039 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Title | German: | FUNKTIONELLES BIOLOGISCHES PFLASTER FÜR BECKENBODENPROLAPS | [2018/30] | English: | FUNCTIONAL BIOLOGICAL PATCH FOR PELVIC FLOOR PROLAPSE | [2018/30] | French: | PATCH BIOLOGIQUE FONCTIONNEL POUR PROLAPSUS DU PLANCHER PELVIEN | [2018/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 30.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/35] | 21.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2005112842 (MPATHY MEDICAL DEVICES LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 18, line 10 - line 21 * * page 19, line 4 - page 20, line 10 * * figure 3 *; | [Y]US2014275753 (NAGALE SANDRA [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,9-11 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0058] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]WO0057812 (ETHICON INC [US]) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, line 11 - line 18 * * page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 6 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2015080648 (FLYNN KENNETH M [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0042] * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP2754412 (BRAUN SURGICAL S A B [ES]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2976788 (CT HOSPITALIER UNIVERSITAIRE NIMES [FR]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |