blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3364782

EP3364782 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MOVING TUBULAR BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2021
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.05.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.07.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G.D S.p.A.
Via Battindarno, 91
40133 Bologna / IT
[2018/35]
Inventor(s)01 / MENGOLI, Fausto
Via Vizzano 32
40037 Sasso Marconi (Bologna) / IT
02 / SARTONI, Massimo
Via Leandro Alberti 79
40139 Bologna / IT
 [2018/35]
Representative(s)Bianciardi, Ezio
Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87
40128 Bologna / IT
[2018/35]
Application number, filing date16795414.812.10.2016
[2018/35]
WO2016IB56090
Priority number, dateIT2015UB0498119.10.2015         Original published format: IT UB20154981
[2018/35]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017068462
Date:27.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3364782
Date:29.08.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3364782
Date:17.06.2020
Language:EN
[2020/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.04.2017
ClassificationIPC:A24C5/32, A24D3/02
[2018/35]
CPC:
A24C5/327 (EP,KR,US); A24C5/323 (EP,KR,US); A24D3/0291 (EP,KR,US);
A24D3/0254 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEWEGEN VON ROHRFÖRMIGEN KÖRPERN[2018/35]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MOVING TUBULAR BODIES[2018/35]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE DÉPLACER DES CORPS TUBULAIRES[2018/35]
Entry into regional phase17.05.2018National basic fee paid 
17.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
17.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/35]
17.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2020Fee for grant paid
07.05.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.05.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)18.03.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.10.2016
AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CY17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
MC17.06.2020
MK17.06.2020
MT17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
TR17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
GB12.10.2020
IE12.10.2020
LU12.10.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
BE31.10.2020
CH31.10.2020
LI31.10.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/27]HU12.10.2016
AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CY17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
MC17.06.2020
MT17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
TR17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
GB12.10.2020
IE12.10.2020
LU12.10.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
BE31.10.2020
CH31.10.2020
LI31.10.2020
Former [2021/46]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
MC17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
GB12.10.2020
IE12.10.2020
LU12.10.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
BE31.10.2020
CH31.10.2020
LI31.10.2020
Former [2021/38]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
MC17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
GB12.10.2020
LU12.10.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
BE31.10.2020
CH31.10.2020
LI31.10.2020
Former [2021/37]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
MC17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
LU12.10.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
BE31.10.2020
CH31.10.2020
LI31.10.2020
Former [2021/36]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
MC17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
LU12.10.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
BE31.10.2020
Former [2021/31]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
MC17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
LU12.10.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
Former [2021/24]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
Former [2021/21]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
Former [2021/10]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
Former [2021/09]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
PT19.10.2020
Former [2021/04]AL17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
NO17.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT17.06.2020
NO17.09.2020
Cited inInternational search[IA]US2988402  (HYMAN POLICANSKY);
 [A]US3393591  (ANTONI RAKOWICZ JAN);
 [A]CA817682  (MOLINS MACHINE CO LTD);
 [A]DE2007615  (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG [DE]);
 [A]DE2513663  (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG);
 [A]EP2708149  (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.