EP3297610 - CRYSTALS AS HOSTS FOR ENTRAPMENT AND SLOW RELEASE OF COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technion Research & Development Foundation Ltd. Senate House Technion City 3200004 Haifa / IL | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POKROY, Boaz Aba Hushi Av. 10a. 3478610 Haifa / IL | 02 /
CALVARESI, Matteo via Cesare Beccaria 17 63082 Castel di Lama (AP) / IT | 03 /
FALINI, Giuseppe via Masia 3/2 Italy Bologna / IT | 04 /
POLISHCHUK, Iryna Yigal Alon 38 apt.8 3298338 Haifa / IL | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16796025.1 | 19.05.2016 | [2018/13] | WO2016IL50533 | Priority number, date | US201562164667P | 21.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562164667 P | [2018/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016185480 | Date: | 24.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3297610 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 24.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/18, A61K31/704, A61K38/28, A61K31/713, A61K33/10, A61K45/06, A61P29/00, A61P3/08, A61P31/00, A61P35/00 | [2024/33] | CPC: |
A61K38/28 (EP,US);
A61K47/6949 (US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
A61K33/10 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/6911 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P29/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/704, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/713, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/10, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/13] | A61K9/18, A61K31/704, A61K38/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] | Title | German: | KRISTALLE ALS WIRTE FÜR DEN EINSCHLUSS UND DIE LANGSAME FREISETZUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN | [2018/13] | English: | CRYSTALS AS HOSTS FOR ENTRAPMENT AND SLOW RELEASE OF COMPOUNDS | [2018/13] | French: | CRISTAUX UTILISÉS EN TANT QU'HÔTES POUR LE PIÉGEAGE ET LA LIBÉRATION PROLONGÉE DE COMPOSÉS | [2018/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 19.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 12.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2018 | 31.05.2021 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN101428009 (SHANGHAI INST PHARM INDUSTRY [CN]); | [E]WO2017077539 (ARIEL-UNIVERSITY RES AND DEV COMPANY LTD [IL]); | International search | [XY] - UKRAINCZYK, M. et al., "Interactions of salicylic acid derivatives with calcite crystals.", Journal of colloid and interface science, vol. 365, no. 1, (20110912), pages 296 - 307, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0021979711011222, XP028323036 [X] 1-5, 6, 7, 9-19 * ) Figures 7 and 8 and sections 3.3 and 3.4 of the paper. Figures 7 and 8 and sections 3.3 and 3.4 of the paper. Figures 7 and 8 and sections 3.3 and 3.4 of the paper. * [Y] 6-8, 21-25, 38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcis.2011.09.009 | [XY] - POKROY, B. et al., "Anisotropic lattice distortions in biogenic calcite induced by intra-crystalline organic molecules.", Journal of structural biology, vol. 155, no. 1, (20060420), pages 96 - 103, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/51047847706000840, XP024905195 [X] 1-5, 20, 34-37, 39, 6,7, 9-19, 26-33 * ) section 2.7;last paragraphs of section 3 section 2.7;last paragraphs of section 3 section 2.7;last paragraphs of section 3 * [Y] 6-8, 38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jsb.2006.03.008 | [XY] - BORUKHIN, S. et al., "Screening the incorporation of amino acids into an inorganic crystalline host: The case of calcite.", Advanced Functional Materials, vol. 22, no. 20, (20120620), pages 4216 - 4224, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1002/adfm.201201079/full, XP055330954 [X] 1-5, 6, 7, 9-19, 26-33, 20, 34-37, 39 * ) experimental section; figure 1. experimental section; figure 1. experimental section; figure 1. * [Y] 6-8, 38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adfm.201201079 | [Y] - PENG, C. et al., "Sustained delivery of doxorubicin by porous CaCO 3 and chitosan/alginate multilayers-coated CaCO 3 microparticles.", Colloids and Surfaces A: Physicochemical and Engineering Aspects, vol. 353, no. 2, (20091110), pages 132 - 139, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0927775709006542, XP026806481 [Y] 6-8, 21-25, 38 * ) section 3.3, starting at page 137 and figure 8 * | [Y] - PENG, H. et al., "Preparation of hierarchical mesoporous CaCO 3 by a facile binary solvent approach as anticancer drug carrier for etoposide.", Nanoscale research letters, vol. 8, no. 1, (20130715), page 1., URL: https://nanoscalereslett.springeropen.com/articles/10.1186/1556-276X-8-321, XP055330958 [Y] 6-8, 21-25 * ) Figure 7;figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1556-276X-8-321 | [Y] - SUKHORUKOV, G. B. et al., "Porous calcium carbonate microparticles as templates for encapsulation of bioactive compounds.", Journal of Materials Chemistry, vol. 14, no. 14, (20040615), pages 2073 - 2081, URL: http://pubs.rsc.org/en/content/articlelanding/2004/jm/b402617a#!divAbstract, XP002352569 [Y] 6, 7 * ) Figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b402617a | [Y] - Wei Wei et al, "Preparation of hierarchical hollow CaC03 particles and the application as anticancer drug carrier.", Journal of the American Chemical Society, vol. 130, no. 47, (20081104), pages 15808 - 15810, URL: http://pubs.acs.org/doi/abs/10.1021/ja8039585, XP055330959 [Y] 6, 7, 21-25, 38 * ) figures 4 and 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja8039585 | [Y] - KONG, X. et al., "Calcium carbonate microparticles used as a gene vector for delivering p53 gene into cancer cells.", Journal of biomedical materials research Part A, vol. 100, no. 9, (20120424), pages 2312 - 2318, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1002/jbm.a.34155/full, XP055330960 [Y] 6, 7, 21-25 * ) Page 2313, paragraph bridging the two columns;page 2313, paragraph bridging the two columns * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jbm.a.34155 |