EP3299311 - STRUCTURE HAVING GEL-LIKE COATING ON SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Co., Ltd. 18-1 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8640 / JP | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Group Holdings, Ltd. 18-1 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8627 / JP | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NYUU, Keisuke c/o Toyo Seikan Co. Ltd. Technical Headquarters 1-70 Yako 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0001 / JP | 02 /
OKADA, Yoshiaki c/o Toyo Seikan Co. Ltd. Technical Headquarters 1-70 Yako 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0001 / JP | 03 /
MIYAZAKI, Tomoyuki c/o Toyo Seikan Co. Ltd. Technical Headquarters 1-70 Yako 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0001 / JP | 04 /
AKUTSU, Yosuke c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings Ltd. Corporate Research&Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | 05 /
IWAMOTO, Shinya c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings Ltd. Corporate Research&Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16796198.6 | 29.03.2016 | [2018/13] | WO2016JP60136 | Priority number, date | JP20150103840 | 21.05.2015 Original published format: JP 2015103840 | [2018/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016185804 | Date: | 24.11.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3299311 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B32B33/00, C09D191/00, B65D23/02, B65D85/72 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (RU,US);
B32B33/00 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B32B1/00 (KR);
B32B27/306 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
B65D1/02 (EP,RU,US);
B65D1/0207 (US);
B65D23/02 (EP,RU,US);
B65D25/14 (EP,RU,US);
B65D65/40 (EP,RU,US);
B65D85/72 (US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C08J7/06 (US);
C09D191/00 (US);
C09D7/63 (US);
B32B2255/10 (US);
B32B2307/746 (KR);
B32B2439/70 (KR,US);
C08J2323/06 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/13] | B65D65/40, B32B33/00, B65D1/02, B65D23/02, B65D25/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] | Title | German: | STRUKTUR MIT GELARTIGER BESCHICHTUNG AUF DER OBERFLÄCHE | [2018/13] | English: | STRUCTURE HAVING GEL-LIKE COATING ON SURFACE | [2018/13] | French: | STRUCTURE À REVÊTEMENT DE SURFACE DE TYPE GEL | [2018/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2017 | Translation filed | 18.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 18.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2005046098 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD); | [XAI]EP1582099 (BAKERY TECHNOLOGY CT B V [NL]); | [XYI]JP2013247881 (YOKOHAMA YUSHI KOGYO KK); | [E]EP3287388 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP], et al) | International search | [A]WO2014010534 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2014126010 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2014188883 (TOYO SEIKAN GROUP HOLDINGS LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2015012358 (TOYO SEIKAN GROUP HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) |