Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018132508 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015101459 | 19.05.2015 | WO2016JP64437 | 16.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3299305 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2019 | A4 | EP3299305 | 28.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015101459 | 19.05.2015 | WO2016JP64437 | 16.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016186068 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015101459 | 19.05.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6055513B | Global Dossier | 27.12.2016 | B2 | JP2016216078 | 22.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2015101459 | 19.05.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201705991 | 16.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2015101459 | 19.05.2015 |