EP3299305 - ULTRAVIOLET STERILIZATION METHOD, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CONTAINER-PACKAGED PRODUCT, AND ULTRAVIOLET STERILIZATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokuyama Corporation 1-1, Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUI, Shingo c/o Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Straße 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2018/13] | Application number, filing date | 16796461.8 | 16.05.2016 | [2018/13] | WO2016JP64437 | Priority number, date | JP20150101459 | 19.05.2015 Original published format: JP 2015101459 | [2018/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016186068 | Date: | 24.11.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3299305 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/10, B65B55/16, B65B55/02 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
B65B55/16 (EP,US);
A23L3/28 (US);
A61L2/10 (EP,US);
B65B55/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/13] | B65B55/16, A23L3/28, A61L2/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] | Title | German: | ULTRAVIOLETTSTERILISIERUNGSVERFAHREN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON IN BEHÄLTER VERPACKTEM PRODUKT UND ULTRAVIOLETTSTERILISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/13] | English: | ULTRAVIOLET STERILIZATION METHOD, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CONTAINER-PACKAGED PRODUCT, AND ULTRAVIOLET STERILIZATION DEVICE | [2018/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE STÉRILISATION AUX ULTRAVIOLETS, PROCÉDÉ POUR FABRIQUER UN PRODUIT EMBALLÉ DANS UN RÉCIPIENT, ET DISPOSITIF DE STÉRILISATION AUX ULTRAVIOLETS | [2018/13] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2017 | Translation filed | 16.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 16.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0912111 (PUREPULSE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4,6-8,10 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0036] - [0038] - [0040] , [0043] , [0046] , [0059] - [0061]; figures 1,8 *; | [A]EP2008669 (MACO PHARMA SA [FR]) [A] 1,3,4,7,8,10 * paragraphs [0011] - [0016] - [0022] - [0026] - [0041] - [0043] - [0061] - [0066]; figures 1,2,6 *; | [A]US2013181141 (BRUECK DANIEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-4,6-8,10* paragraphs [0018] - [0022] - [0029] , [0032] , [0036]; figure 5 * | International search | [XYA]JP2000511497 (Purepulse Technologies, Inc.) [X] 1-6, 9 * , page 13, line 6 to page 36, line 15; fig. 1 to 12 & US 5786598 A column 5, line 35 to column 12, line 14; fig. 1 to 8 & US 5925885 A & US 6433344 B1 & US 6566659 B1 & US 2003/0155531 A1 & WO 1997/043915 A1 & EP 1413318 A1 & DE 69726425 T2 & AU 3000797 A & CA 2254977 A1 & AU 710860 B2 * [Y] 8 [A] 7, 10-13; | [Y]JP2002068202 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD) [Y] 8 * , paragraphs [0011] to [0013]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005052294 (IWASAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007126189 (IWASAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-13* , (Family: none) *; | [A]GB2457057 (GB ENVIRONMENTAL LTD [GB]) [A] 1-13 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014516013 (Ozonica Ltd.) [A] 1-13 * , & US 2012/0288405 A1 & US 2014/0119991 A1 & GB 2490794 A & WO 2012/153134 A2 & AU 2012252164 A1 & CA 2835562 A1 & CN 103619712 A & MX 2013013107 A & RU 2013154490 A & NZ 618094 A & ZA 201308984 B * |