EP3295348 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DEFENDING AGAINST NETWORK ATTACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IE | published on 28.05.2025 [2025/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alibaba Group Holding Limited Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town Grand Cayman / KY | [2023/36] |
Former [2018/12] | For all designated states Alibaba Group Holding Limited Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town Grand Cayman / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Han Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F Building 3 No. 969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou 311121 / CN | 02 /
DUAN, Yaxiong Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F Building 3 No. 969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou 311121 / CN | 03 /
JIA, Jiong Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F Building 3 No. 969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou 311121 / CN | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | McKinnon, Alistair James WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/36] | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | ||
Former [2018/12] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16797001.1 | 13.05.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016US32316 | Priority number, date | CN201510250887 | 15.05.2015 Original published format: CN201510250887 | US201615153534 | 12.05.2016 Original published format: US201615153534 | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016186996 | Date: | 24.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3295348 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3295348 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, G06F21/00, H04L43/0876, H04L43/16, H04L67/02 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
H04L63/1458 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04L63/1466 (CN);
H04L43/0876 (EP,KR,US);
H04L43/16 (EP,KR,US);
H04L63/0236 (EP,KR,US);
H04L63/1425 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L67/02 (EP,KR,RU,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/01] | H04L29/06, G06F21/00, H04L29/08, H04L12/26 | ||
Former IPC [2018/12] | G06F21/00, H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABWEHR VON NETZWERKANGRIFFEN | [2018/12] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DEFENDING AGAINST NETWORK ATTACKS | [2018/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉFENSE CONTRE DES ATTAQUES DE RÉSEAU | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 01.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 01.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | BG | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | IE | 13.05.2024 | LU | 13.05.2024 | BE | 31.05.2024 | CH | 31.05.2024 | [2025/22] |
Former [2025/11] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
BG | 06.09.2023 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
LU | 13.05.2024 | ||
CH | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2025/08] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
BG | 06.09.2023 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
LU | 13.05.2024 | ||
Former [2025/07] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
BG | 06.09.2023 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/51] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
BG | 06.09.2023 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN104202314 (CHINA UNICOM) [X] 1-4,6,7,14,15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0079] *[I] 5,8-13 | International search | [A]US2002166063 (LACHMAN JOHN PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-22* , entire document. *; | [A]US2007097976 (WOOD GEORGE D [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * , entire document. *; | [A]US2008270601 (ISHIKAWA MARK M [US]) [A] 1-22 * , entire document. *; | [A]US2009031040 (JAYAWARDENA THUSITHA [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * , entire document. *; | [XY]US2014109225 (HOLLOWAY LEE HAHN [US], et al) [X] 1, 3-11, 21, 22 * , Abstract, Paragraphs [0022], [0026], [0034]-[0036], [0043], [0050], [0070], [0072]-[0074], [0082], [0095], [0105], [0120], [0127], [0139], Claims 1, 14. * [Y] 2, 12, 14-17, 19 | [Y] - "Local RBL Configuration''.", LIBRAESVA., (20140907), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://docs.libraesva.com/libraesvamanual/system/locairblconfiguration, (20160719) [Y] 2, 12, 14-17, 19 * . * | by applicant | CN104202314 |