EP3298227 - LOUVER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2021 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Serralux Inc. 599 21432 Broadway Rd. Los Gatos, CA 95044 / US | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARDINER, Mark E. 1819 Judson Ct. Santa Rosa, California 95401 / US | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16797417.9 | 20.05.2016 | [2018/13] | WO2016US33637 | Priority number, date | US201562164834P | 21.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562164834 P | [2018/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016187590 | Date: | 24.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3298227 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 24.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/26, F21S11/00, F21V7/04 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
F21S11/007 (EP,US);
F21S11/002 (EP,US);
G02B19/0019 (EP,US);
G02B19/0042 (EP,US);
G02B2207/123 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] | Title | German: | JALOUSIEANORDNUNG | [2018/13] | English: | LOUVER ASSEMBLY | [2018/13] | French: | ENSEMBLE À LAMES | [2018/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 21.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/31] | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2018 | 31.05.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2015056736 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,5,10,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0104] * * figure 6 * [I] 4,12-14; | [XI]WO2014024146 (ECOLE POLYTECH [CH]) [X] 1,4,5,10 * page 8, line 1 - page 17, line 17 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 12-14; | [XI]WO2014078812 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [X] 1,5,10,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0162] * * figure 2c * [I] 4,12-14; | [I]WO2014196596 (SHARP KK [JP]) [I] 1,2,4,5,10,12-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0308] * * figure 18 *; | [A]EP2560032 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0078] * * figure 2 * | International search | [XY]WO2014078812 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [X] 1-9, 22-26, 29-34 * The whole document The whole document * [Y] 10-21, 27, 28; | [Y]US2012033302 (SUZUKI MASAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 10-21, 27, 28 * The whole document *; | [A]US5461496 (KANADA YOSHIMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-34 * The whole document *; | [A]US2014104689 (PADIYATH RAGHUNATH [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * The whole document * | by applicant | WO2015056736 |