EP3384300 - METHOD FOR DETECTING AN OPEN LOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vitesco Technologies GmbH Siemensstraße 12 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2021/48] |
Former [2021/18] | For all designated states Vitesco Technologies GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2021/03] | For all designated states Continental Automotive France S.A.S 1 Avenue Paul Ourliac BP 1149 31100 Toulouse / FR | ||
For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | |||
Former [2020/52] | For all designated states Continental Automotive France 1 Avenue Paul Ourliac BP 1149 31100 Toulouse / FR | ||
For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | |||
Former [2020/35] | For all designated states Continental Automotive France Service Intellectual Property 1 avenue Paul Ourliac 31100 Toulouse / FR | ||
For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | |||
Former [2018/41] | For all designated states Continental Automotive France Service Intellectual Property 1 avenue Paul Ourliac 31100 Toulouse / FR | ||
For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAVOIS, Thierry 1 Rue Gabriel de Coignard Appt 11 Bâtiment A 31100 Toulouse / FR | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Vitesco Technologies Landsberger Str. 187, Haus D 80687 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 16798629.8 | 18.11.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016EP01929 | Priority number, date | FR20150061810 | 03.12.2015 Original published format: FR 1561810 | [2018/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017092846 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3384300 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/34, G01R31/02, G01R31/42, G01R31/28 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
G01R31/343 (EP,US);
G01R31/007 (US);
G01R31/40 (US);
G01R31/52 (EP,US);
G01R31/54 (EP,US);
G01R31/2812 (EP,US);
G01R31/42 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION EINER OFFENEN LADUNG | [2018/41] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING AN OPEN LOAD | [2018/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETECTION DE CHARGE OUVERTE | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 22.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/02] | 06.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/02] | Request for further processing for: | 22.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.04.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO2014074290 (NEWPORT CORP [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraphs [0035] , [0036] , [0039] , [0049] , [0053] , [0056]; figures 1,2a,2b,5a,5b,6 * [A] 8-10 [I] 2-7; | [A]EP2139105 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] - [0006]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0030] , [0037] - paragraphs [0041] , [0050] *; | [A]EP0848492 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - "Application Note PROFET+ CURRENT SENSE What the designer should know", Munich, Germany, (20140314), pages 1 - 34, URL: http://www.infineon.com/dgdl/Infineon-PROFET _Current_Sense-AN-v01_01-EN.pdf, (20160512), XP055272197 [A] 1-10 * page 7 - page 19 * |