EP3379963 - SOLE, PARTICULARLY FOR SHOES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diadora S.p.A. Via Montello, 80 31031 Caerano di San Marco / IT | [2019/14] |
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states Diadora Sport S.r.l. Via Montello 80 31031 Caerano Di San Marco / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASON, Angelo Via Monte Grappa 180 31031 Caerano Di San Marco / IT | 02 /
POLEGATO MORETTI, Enrico Via G. Fantin 90 31035 Crocetta Del Montello / IT | [2018/40] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [2018/40] | Application number, filing date | 16798795.7 | 23.11.2016 | [2018/40] | WO2016EP78567 | Priority number, date | IT2015UB05851 | 24.11.2015 Original published format: IT UB20155851 | [2018/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017089406 | Date: | 01.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3379963 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3379963 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/12, A43B13/18 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
A43B13/127 (EP,US);
A43B13/125 (US);
A43B13/04 (US);
A43B13/185 (EP,US);
A43B7/141 (US);
A43B7/1475 (US);
B32B3/266 (US);
A43B13/18 (US);
A43B13/181 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] | Extension states | BA | 22.06.2018 | ME | 22.06.2018 | Validation states | MA | 22.06.2018 | MD | 22.06.2018 | Title | German: | SOHLE, INSBESONDERE FÜR SCHUHE | [2018/40] | English: | SOLE, PARTICULARLY FOR SHOES | [2018/40] | French: | SEMELLE, EN PARTICULIER POUR CHAUSSURES | [2018/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 22.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | LU | 23.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009106076 (ECCO SKO AS [DK], et al); | [XI]US2009241373 (KITA KENJIRO [JP], et al); | [A]GB2471459 (OLUWA BODE [GB]); | [A]US2014331517 (SEO WOO SEUNG [KR]) | Examination | EP1955607 | US2013219746 |