|
10.04.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2023 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2023 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.03.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2023 |
Request for delayed grant (upcoming introduction of UPP) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2022 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.10.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
26.10.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
01.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.08.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.04.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.04.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
70 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
04.01.2017 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
23.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
12 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
12 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |