Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11882898 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2024 | B2 | US2018368516 | 27.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP78567 | 23.11.2016 | ITUB20155851 | 24.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6884793B | Global Dossier | 09.06.2021 | B2 | JP2018535076 | 29.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP78567 | 23.11.2016 | ITUB20155851 | 24.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108289527B | Global Dossier | 06.02.2024 | B | CN108289527 | 17.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP78567 | 23.11.2016 | ITUB20155851 | 24.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3379963 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2023 | B1 | EP3379963 | 03.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP78567 | 23.11.2016 | ITUB20155851 | 24.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3379963T | 28.08.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP78567 | 23.11.2016 | ITUB20155851 | 24.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2954209T | 20.11.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP78567 | 23.11.2016 | ITUB20155851 | 24.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3379963T | 16.10.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP78567 | 23.11.2016 | ITUB20155851 | 24.11.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017089406 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITUB20155851 | 24.11.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITUB20155851 | 24.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITUB20155851 | 24.11.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA43297 | 03.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | ITUB20155851 | 24.11.2015 |