|
18.05.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.02.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
03.02.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
04.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.06.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.03.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.10.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.12.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2016 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
38 |