EP3300422 - BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHINO, Tooru c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
HAPSARI, Wuri Andarmawanti c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
UMESH, Anil c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI, Hideaki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 05 /
ABETA, Sadayuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/13] | Application number, filing date | 16799625.5 | 01.03.2016 | [2018/13] | WO2016JP56245 | Priority number, date | JP20150104999 | 22.05.2015 Original published format: JP 2015104999 | [2018/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016189916 | Date: | 01.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3300422 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/04, H04W28/12, H04W92/20, H04L1/18, H04L1/00 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
H04L1/1825 (EP,US);
H04W28/04 (US);
H04L1/1887 (EP,US);
H04W72/51 (US);
H04W88/085 (EP,US);
H03M13/03 (US);
H04L1/1822 (EP,US);
H04L2001/0097 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W92/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/13] | H04W28/04, H04W28/12, H04W92/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] | Title | German: | BASISSTATION | [2018/13] | English: | BASE STATION | [2018/13] | French: | STATION DE BASE | [2018/13] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2017 | Translation filed | 01.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 14.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/46] | 07.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.06.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007275657 (CHANG YOUNG-BIN [KR], et al) [X] 1-5 * figure 3A * * paragraphs [0048] - [0061] * * tables 1, 2 *; | [IA]US2009060010 (MAHESHWARI SHASHIKANT [US], et al) [I] 6,9,10 * figures 1B, 4 * * paragraphs [0007] - [0008] * * paragraphs [0062] - [0063] *[A] 7,8; | [X]WO2009050174 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-5 * figures 3-7 * * page 9, line 1 - page 9, line 18 * * page 11, line 7 - page 11, line 15 * * page 13, line 2 - page 13, line 32 * * page 15, line 9 - page 15, line 35 * * page 17, line 1 - page 22, line 5 *; | [IA]US2009191882 (KOVACS ISTVAN Z [DK], et al) [I] 6,9,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0025] - [0028] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0060] * * paragraphs [0071] - [0078] * [A] 7,8; | [X]US2013094431 (TERRY STEPHEN E [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * figures 8, 9, 14 * * paragraphs [0042] - [0050] * * paragraphs [0072] - [0082] * | International search | [XY]JP2013502793 (Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) [X] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0038] to [0052]; fig. 1, 4, 5 & US 2012/0170504 A1 & WO 2011/020922 A1 page 11, line 20 to page 17, line 3; fig. 1, 4, 5 * [Y] 6-10; | [Y]WO2014006936 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 6-10* , paragraphs [0008] to [0022] & US 2015/0172937 A1 paragraphs [0008] to [0028] * |