03.02.2023 |
Refusal of application |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
16.10.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
03.10.2022 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
06.04.2022 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
25.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
24.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.02.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.10.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.10.2020 |
First examination report |
|
25.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.07.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
21.12.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
21.12.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
27.07.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
27.07.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
27.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.03.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
09.03.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
09.03.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
05.02.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.11.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
17.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|