EP3195788 - ENDOSCOPE CURVED PORTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SETO, Hideyuki c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
NARA, Takashi c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16799719.6 | 20.04.2016 | [2017/30] | WO2016JP62546 | Priority number, date | JP20150109049 | 28.05.2015 Original published format: JP 2015109049 | [2017/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016190011 | Date: | 01.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3195788 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, G02B23/24 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
A61B1/0055 (EP,US);
A61B1/0051 (US);
A61B1/00 (US);
A61B1/00073 (US);
A61B1/00098 (US);
A61B1/005 (US);
A61B1/0057 (EP,US);
G02B23/24 (US);
G02B23/2476 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | GEKRÜMMTER ABSCHNITT EINES ENDOSKOPS | [2017/30] | English: | ENDOSCOPE CURVED PORTION | [2017/30] | French: | PARTIE INCURVÉE D'ENDOSCOPE | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2017 | Translation filed | 20.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 20.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 29.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6379901U (Asahi Optical Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-10 * , fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0398803U (Asahi Glass Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-10 * , fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH045802U (Asahi Glass Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-10* , fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [XYA]JP2009213509 (FUJINON CORP) [X] 1, 3-6 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0018]; fig. 1(B) & US 2009/0227842 A1 paragraphs [0056] to [0061]; fig. 9B * [Y] 10 [A] 2, 7-9; | [A]JP2009213508 (FUJINON CORP) [A] 1-10 * , fig. 2 & US 2009/0227842 A1 fig. 2 *; | [Y]JP2011019570 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP) [Y] 10 * , paragraph [0039] (Family: none) * |