EP3306831 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING FEEDBACK INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jung Ju 715-202 190-15 Seochangnamsunhwan-ro Namdong-gu Incheon 21616 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Yongseok 915-1602 27 Bongyeong-ro 1517beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16700 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Hyunyong 109-2601 35 Gomurae-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 06597 / KR | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 16800292.1 | 25.05.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016KR05503 | Priority number, date | KR20150074151 | 27.05.2015 Original published format: KR 20150074151 | [2018/15] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016190653 | Date: | 01.12.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3306831 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08, H04B7/06, H04B7/04 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B7/043 (US);
H04B7/0421 (US);
H04B7/0641 (US);
H04B7/0658 (EP,US);
H04B7/066 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON FEEDBACK-INFORMATIONEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2018/15] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING FEEDBACK INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2018/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION D'INFORMATIONS DE RÉTROACTION DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2017 | Translation filed | 21.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 21.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/16] | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2013301454 (SEOL JI-YUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10,14,15 * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0128] * * figure 9 *[A] 4-7,11-13; | [XA]US2014307654 (KIM YUNG-SOO [KR]) [X] 1-3,8-10,14,15 * paragraph [0153] - paragraph [0155] * * figures 4-6 * [A] 4-7,11-13 | International search | [A]US2008051150 (TSUTSUI MASAFUMI [JP]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0028]-[0045]; and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]KR20130017932 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-3, 8-10, 14, 15 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0068]; figures 3-7: and claims 1, 5, 6. *; | [YA]US2013072243 (YU HYUN-KYU [KR], et al) [Y] 1-3, 8-10, 14, 15 * See paragraphs [0087]-[0091], [0111]-[0119]; and figures 5, 12. * [A] 4-7, 11-13; | [A]US2013231059 (PRASAD NARAYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0083], [0093]-[0126]; and figures 2, 3, 6, 7, 9. *; | [Y]US2013343211 (LIU JIANHAN [US], et al) [Y] 2, 9 * See paragraphs [0024], [0047]; and figures 2, 9. * |