EP3311466 - SYSTEM, APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING WIRELESS CHARGING ALIGNMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jabil Inc. 10560 Dr. Martin Luther King Jr. St. North St. Petersburg, Florida 33716 / US | [2018/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALDWELL, Barry E. 10560 Dr. Martin Luther King Jr. Drive N. St. Petersburg, Florida 33716 / US | 02 /
SUAREZ, Gustavo Armando 10560 Dr. Martin Luther King Jr. Drive N. St. Petersburg, Florida 33716 / US | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2018/17] | Application number, filing date | 16800782.1 | 27.05.2016 | [2018/17] | WO2016US34583 | Priority number, date | US201514724596 | 28.05.2015 Original published format: US201514724596 | [2018/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016191656 | Date: | 01.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3311466 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18, H02J50/90, H02J50/80, H02J7/02, H04B5/00 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
B60L53/35 (EP,CN,US);
H02J50/90 (CN);
B60L53/38 (EP,CN,US);
B60L53/12 (CN,US);
B60L53/36 (EP,CN,US);
B60L53/39 (EP,CN,US);
H02J50/10 (CN);
H02J50/12 (CN);
H02J50/40 (CN);
H02J50/70 (CN);
H02J50/80 (CN);
H02J7/00034 (CN);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T90/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/17] | H02J50/90, H02J50/80, H02J7/02, H04B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG EINER DRAHTLOSLADEAUSRICHTUNG | [2018/17] | English: | SYSTEM, APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING WIRELESS CHARGING ALIGNMENT | [2018/17] | French: | SYSTÈME, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'OPTIMISATION D'ALIGNEMENT DE CHARGE SANS FIL | [2018/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 20.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5617003 (ODACHI YASUHARU [JP], et al); | [I]US2009079387 (JIN MIKIMOTO [JP], et al); | [I]US2010315038 (TERAO KYOZO [JP], et al); | [I]US2011187320 (MURAYAMA YUJI [JP]) | International search | [Y]US2015094887 (KAWASHIMA KIYOTAKA [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs 33-93, claims 1-28 and figures 1-8. *; | [Y]EP2793359 (HANSHINKIJEON CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs 32-47, claims 1-14 and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2014217966 (SCHNEIDER JESSE M [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs 28-44 and figures 1-6. *; | [A]US2011074349 (GHOVANLOO MAYSAM [US]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs 32-61 and figures 1-5. *; | [A]US2011187320 (MURAYAMA YUJI [JP]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs 101-170 and figures 10A-21. * | by applicant | US5617003 | US2011187320 | US2010315038 | US2009079387 |