EP3545666 - FIRST NETWORK NODE, SECOND NETWORK NODE, THIRD NETWORK NODE, WIRELESS DEVICE AND METHODS PERFORMED THEREBY, FOR HANDLING CONTENT IN AN INFORMATION-CENTRIC NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INAM, Rafia Ringduvegatan 63, 1101 724 70 Västerås / SE | 02 /
VULGARAKIS FELJAN, Aneta Redskapsvägen 84 162 43 Vällingby / SE | 03 /
LINDQVIST, Neiva Docentbacken 3, 1603 SE-114 18 STOCKHOLM / SE | 04 /
TESLENKO, Maxim Lillies Väg 80 192 74 Sollentuna / SE | 05 /
VANDIKAS, Konstantinos Anders Lundströms Gata 18 169 73 Solna / SE | 06 /
PAPPA, Ioanna Fatburs Brunnsgata 11, 3tr SE-118 28 STOCKHOLM / SE | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 16801453.8 | 24.11.2016 | [2019/40] | WO2016EP78734 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018095531 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3545666 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3545666 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/568, H04L67/5681, H04L67/63 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
H04L67/63 (EP,US);
H04W8/08 (US);
H04L67/568 (EP);
H04W64/003 (US);
H04L67/5681 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/40] | H04L29/08, H04W40/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERSTER NETZWERKKNOTEN, ZWEITER NETZWERKKNOTEN, DRITTER NETZWERKKNOTEN, DRAHTLOSE VORRICHTUNG UND DADURCH AUSGEFÜHRTE VERFAHREN ZUR HANDHABUNG VON INHALTEN IN EINEM INFORMATIONSZENTRIERTEN NETZWERK | [2019/40] | English: | FIRST NETWORK NODE, SECOND NETWORK NODE, THIRD NETWORK NODE, WIRELESS DEVICE AND METHODS PERFORMED THEREBY, FOR HANDLING CONTENT IN AN INFORMATION-CENTRIC NETWORK | [2019/40] | French: | PREMIER, DEUXIÈME ET TROISIÈME NOEUD DE RÉSEAU, DISPOSITIF SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉS EXÉCUTÉS PAR CE DERNIER, POUR GÉRER UN CONTENU DANS UN RÉSEAU CENTRÉ SUR L'INFORMATION | [2019/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 22.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 24.06.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.07.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.11.2016 | AL | 17.08.2022 | AT | 17.08.2022 | BG | 17.08.2022 | CY | 17.08.2022 | CZ | 17.08.2022 | EE | 17.08.2022 | ES | 17.08.2022 | FI | 17.08.2022 | HR | 17.08.2022 | LT | 17.08.2022 | LV | 17.08.2022 | MC | 17.08.2022 | MK | 17.08.2022 | MT | 17.08.2022 | PL | 17.08.2022 | RO | 17.08.2022 | RS | 17.08.2022 | SE | 17.08.2022 | SI | 17.08.2022 | SK | 17.08.2022 | SM | 17.08.2022 | TR | 17.08.2022 | NO | 17.11.2022 | GR | 18.11.2022 | IE | 24.11.2022 | LU | 24.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | FR | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | IS | 17.12.2022 | PT | 19.12.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 24.11.2016 | |
AL | 17.08.2022 | ||
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
BG | 17.08.2022 | ||
CY | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
MK | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
TR | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IE | 24.11.2022 | ||
LU | 24.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 24.11.2016 | |
AL | 17.08.2022 | ||
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CY | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
MK | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
TR | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IE | 24.11.2022 | ||
LU | 24.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 24.11.2016 | |
AL | 17.08.2022 | ||
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CY | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
MK | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IE | 24.11.2022 | ||
LU | 24.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 24.11.2016 | |
AL | 17.08.2022 | ||
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CY | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IE | 24.11.2022 | ||
LU | 24.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 24.11.2016 | |
AL | 17.08.2022 | ||
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IE | 24.11.2022 | ||
LU | 24.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IE | 24.11.2022 | ||
LU | 24.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IE | 24.11.2022 | ||
LU | 24.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
LU | 24.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2012117240 (OMAR HASSAN M [US]) [Y] 4,5,10-14,25,26,29-31 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0029] *; | [XY]US2013039249 (RAVINDRAN RAVISHANKAR [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,19-24,27,28,34 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0047] * [Y] 4,5,10-14,25,26,29-31; | [X]US2014112307 (KIM JONG-HWAN [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,19-24,34 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044] *; | [A] - VASILIOS A SIRIS ET AL, "A Selective Neighbor Caching Approach for Supporting Mobility in Publish/Subscribe Networks", (20110614), pages 63 - 67, PROCEEDINGS OF THE 5TH ERCIM WORKSHOP ON EMOBILITY (IN CONJUNCTION WITH WWIC 2011), JUNE 14, 2011 - VILANOVA I LA GELTRÚ, CATALONIA, SPAIN,, URL: http://atlas.tk.informatik.tu-darmstadt.de/Publications/2011/TUD-CS-2011-2893.pdf#page=69, (20130123), XP002690920 [A] 1-14,19-31,34 * page 1 - page 3 * | [A] - BURCEA I ET AL, "Disconnected operation in publish/subscribe middleware", MOBILE DATA MANAGEMENT, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. 2004 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CON FERENCE ON BERKELEY, CA, USA 19-22 JAN. 2004, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20040119), doi:10.1109/MDM.2004.1263041, ISBN 978-0-7695-2070-4, pages 39 - 50, XP010681042 [A] 1-14,19-31,34 * page 6 - page 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MDM.2004.1263041 |