|
21.06.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2022 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.07.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.04.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.04.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
07.04.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
23.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.09.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2019 |
Change to the inventor details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2019 |
Change to the inventor details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2019 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.07.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.06.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.06.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
63 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
24.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
8 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
39 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
14 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |