13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
24.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
30.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
23.06.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
05.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
17.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
10.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
15.07.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
09.07.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.07.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.07.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.04.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.03.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] |
04.03.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] |
01.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.04.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.12.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.11.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.09.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.05.2020 |
First examination report |
|
16.05.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.01.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
31.01.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
02.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
30.08.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
30.08.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
13.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
25.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|