Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018095531 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP78734 | 24.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11102639 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2021 | B2 | US2020296570 | 17.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP78734 | 24.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3545666 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2022 | B1 | EP3545666 | 02.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP78734 | 24.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3545666T | 29.08.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP78734 | 24.11.2016 |