EP3361878 - PROCESS FOR TREATING GASEOUS EFFLUENTS DEVELOPED IN COFFEE ROASTING INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Luigi Lavazza S.p.A. Via Bologna 32 10152 Torino / IT | [2020/26] |
Former [2018/34] | For all designated states Luigi Lavazza S.p.A. Via Bologna 32 10152 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURFORI, Stefania Strada Settimo 410 10156 Torino / IT | 02 /
ZATTARIN, Luciano Via Cardinale Gaetano Alimonda 9 10152 Torino / IT | 03 /
DEORSOLA, Fabio, Alessandro Corso B. Telesio 36 10146 Torino / IT | 04 /
BENSAID, Samir Corso Racconigi 5 Scala B 10138 Torino / IT | 05 /
RUSSO, Nunzio Corso Regina Margherita 214 10144 Torino / IT | 06 /
FINO, Debora Via Po 3 10124 Torino / IT | 07 /
PIRONE, Raffaele Via Po 3 10124 Torino / IT | 08 /
PIUMETTI, Marco Via Quintino Sella 44 12100 Cuneo / IT | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | Gerbino, Angelo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2020/26] |
Former [2018/34] | Rondano, Davide, et al Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 16801568.3 | 14.10.2016 | [2018/34] | WO2016IB56154 | Priority number, date | IT2015UB04976 | 16.10.2015 Original published format: IT UB20154976 | [2018/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017064654 | Date: | 20.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3361878 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3361878 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A23F5/04 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
B01D53/864 (EP,US);
A23F5/04 (EP,US);
A23N12/125 (EP,US);
B01J29/14 (US);
B01D2255/20738 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
B01D2255/50 (EP,US);
B01D2257/502 (EP,US);
B01D2257/70 (EP,US);
B01D2257/708 (US);
B01D2258/0275 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (US);
Y02A50/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG DER GASFÖRMIGEN EFFLÜSE, DIE IN EINER KAFFEERÖSTENANLAGE ENTWICKELT WERDEN | [2020/01] | English: | PROCESS FOR TREATING GASEOUS EFFLUENTS DEVELOPED IN COFFEE ROASTING INSTALLATION | [2018/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DES EFFLUENTS GAZEUX DÉVELOPÉS DANS UNE INSTALLATION DE TORREFACTION DE CAFÉ | [2020/01] |
Former [2018/34] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON IN EINER KAFFEERÖSTANLAGE ENTWICKELTEN GASFÖRMIGEN ABLEITUNGEN | ||
Former [2018/34] | PROCÉDÉ POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'EFFLUENTS GAZEUX DÉVELOPPÉS DANS UNE INSTALLATION POUR LA TORRÉFACTION DU CAFÉ | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 07.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.10.2016 | AL | 24.06.2020 | AT | 24.06.2020 | CY | 24.06.2020 | CZ | 24.06.2020 | DK | 24.06.2020 | EE | 24.06.2020 | ES | 24.06.2020 | FI | 24.06.2020 | HR | 24.06.2020 | LT | 24.06.2020 | LV | 24.06.2020 | MC | 24.06.2020 | MK | 24.06.2020 | MT | 24.06.2020 | NL | 24.06.2020 | PL | 24.06.2020 | RO | 24.06.2020 | RS | 24.06.2020 | SE | 24.06.2020 | SI | 24.06.2020 | SK | 24.06.2020 | SM | 24.06.2020 | TR | 24.06.2020 | BG | 24.09.2020 | NO | 24.09.2020 | GR | 25.09.2020 | IE | 14.10.2020 | LU | 14.10.2020 | IS | 24.10.2020 | PT | 26.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 14.10.2016 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
MT | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
TR | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IE | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 14.10.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IE | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 14.10.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
LU | 14.10.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
LU | 14.10.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
LU | 14.10.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 24.06.2020 | |
NO | 24.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB741900 (OXY CATALYST INC) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-11 *; | [Y]US4124536 (ITOH TAKUJI, et al) [Y] 1-4 * tables 4,5 *; | [I]EP0800855 (SARA LEE DE NV [NL]) [I] 1-4 * page 2, line 51 - page 3, line 27; example 1; claims 1-9 *; | [Y]US2006165853 (EKANAYAKE ATHULA [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0014]; claims 1-20 *; | [XI]EP1787720 (NIKKI UNIVERSAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] - [0022] - [0049] - [0061]; claims 1-15 * [I] 2-4; | [A]US7306824 (COKER ERIC N [US]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-15 *; | [A]WO2009007246 (ILLYCAFFE SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-39 *; | [A]US2011092356 (ROLLINS HARRY W [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-48 *; | [A]US2011281720 (ANDERSEN PAUL JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-4* paragraph [0074]; claims 21-40 * |