EP3380468 - BIS-PYRIDAZINE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE IN TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cancer Research Technology Limited 2 Redman Place London E20 1JQ / GB | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/21] | For all designated states Astrazeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | ||
For all designated states Cancer Research Technology Ltd. Angel Building 407 St. John Street London EC1V 4AD / GB | |||
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states Astrazeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | ||
For all designated states Cancer Research Technology Ltd. Angel Building 407 St. John Street London EC1V 4AD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINLAY, Maurice, Raymond, Verschoyle AstraZeneca R&D Cambridge Darwin Building Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0FZ / GB | [2018/40] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/21] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2018/40] | AstraZeneca Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB | Application number, filing date | 16801774.7 | 25.11.2016 | [2018/40] | WO2016EP78899 | Priority number, date | GB20150020959 | 27.11.2015 Original published format: GB 201520959 | [2018/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017089587 | Date: | 01.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3380468 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3380468 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3380468 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/14, A61K31/501, A61P35/00 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
C07D403/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/501 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] | Extension states | BA | 27.06.2018 | ME | 27.06.2018 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIS-PYRIDAZIN-VERBINDUNGEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2018/40] | English: | BIS-PYRIDAZINE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE IN TREATING CANCER | [2018/40] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE BIS-PYRIDAZINE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2018/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 19.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 25.02.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 25.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.03.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2016 | AL | 20.05.2020 | AT | 20.05.2020 | CY | 20.05.2020 | CZ | 20.05.2020 | EE | 20.05.2020 | HR | 20.05.2020 | LT | 20.05.2020 | LV | 20.05.2020 | MC | 20.05.2020 | MK | 20.05.2020 | MT | 20.05.2020 | PL | 20.05.2020 | RO | 20.05.2020 | RS | 20.05.2020 | SI | 20.05.2020 | SK | 20.05.2020 | SM | 20.05.2020 | TR | 20.05.2020 | BG | 20.08.2020 | GR | 21.08.2020 | IS | 20.09.2020 | PT | 21.09.2020 | LU | 25.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.11.2016 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
MT | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
TR | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | LT | 20.05.2020 | |
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 20.05.2020 | |
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 20.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2015101957 (RHIZEN PHARMACEUTICALS SA [CH]) [A] 1-15 * whole document specially claim 1 and examples *; | [AP]WO2015181539 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [AP] 1-15* Whole document, specially claim 1 * | by applicant | - CURI ET AL., FRONT. BIOSC., (2007), vol. 12, pages 344 - 57 | - DEBARDINIS; CHENG, ONCOGENE, vol. 2009, pages 313 - 324 | - KOPPENOL ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS, (2011), vol. 11, pages 325 - 337 | - HENSLEY ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2013), vol. 123, pages 3678 - 3684 | - DANG, CANCER RES., (2010), vol. 70, pages 859 - 863 | - ELGADI ET AL., PHYSIOL. GENOMICS, (1999), vol. 1, pages 51 - 62 | - CASSAGO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2012), vol. 109, pages 1092 - 1097 | - WANG ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2010), vol. 18, pages 207 - 219 | - VAN DER HEUVAL ET AL., CANCER BIO. THER., (2012), vol. 13, pages 1185 - 1194 |